Ambulatory Services Corporation v. Wilson et al
Plaintiff: Ambulatory Services Corporation
Defendant: Albert Wilson and OK Program, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01672
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice by Albert Wilson. (Weber, Janelle)
September 6, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Albert Wilson. Related case(s): No (Weber, Janelle)
September 6, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Janelle Alicia Weber on behalf of Albert Wilson (Weber, Janelle)
September 6, 2019 Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Poznanski, Howard)
August 22, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Ambulatory Services Corporation by OK Program, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Albert Wilson note, #2 Exhibit Albert Wilson note assignment, #3 Affidavit Lost note affidavit, #4 Exhibit Brenda Wilson note assignment, #5 Exhibit statements of account)(Axelman, David)
August 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of TELEPHONIC HEARING on #6 MOTION to remand to State Court and Supporting Memorandum of Law set for 9/26/2019 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. Counsel are directed to call the reserved conference toll-free number at 1-888-557-8511. Enter the access code: 4744914 followed by the #(pound) key. You will be prompted to enter the security code followed by the #(pound) key. The security code will be emailed to you. This conference will be activated at 8:30 AM so the hearing may start promptly at 9:00 AM. (CCB)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Motion for Albert Wilson to be deemed served. A competent return of service was filed at Dkt. 12. Wilson is deemed served, and shall respond to the complaint within twenty days of today's date. If Wilson contests service, he may do so properly by filing same. If Wilson does not respond as required, Plaintiff may seek default remedies. Plaintiff is Ordered to provide this endorsed Order to Wilson via Fedex at the last known address, and also by email and Fedex to Peter Cianchetta, who represents himself as Wilson's California counsel and is communicating with Plaintiff's counsel on Wilson's behalf. If Plaintiff moves for default, Plaintiff should file proof of Plaintiff's compliance with this Order. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 8/21/2019. (Jung, William)
August 20, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically To Deem Defendant, Albert Wilson, Served or, in the alternative, To Authorize Service By Publication or, in the alternative, Issuance of an Alias Summons by Ambulatory Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Poznanski, Howard)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or respond #1 complaint. OK Program, Inc.'s answer or response due 8/22/2019. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 8/15/2019. (CCB)
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by OK Program, Inc. (Axelman, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to remand to State Court and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by OK Program, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Albert Wilson)(Axelman, David)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF of service by Ambulatory Services Corporation (Poznanski, Howard)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant OK Program, Inc.'s answer or response is due on or before 8/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 8/2/2019. (AHA)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by OK Program, Inc. (Axelman, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF of service by Ambulatory Services Corporation (Poznanski, Howard)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice by Ambulatory Services Corporation. (Poznanski, Howard)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice by OK Program, Inc. (Axelman, David)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to remand to State Court and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Ambulatory Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Poznanski, Howard)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ambulatory Services Corporation. (Poznanski, Howard)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard Poznanski on behalf of Ambulatory Services Corporation (Poznanski, Howard)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 7/12/2019. (SAO)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:19-cv-1672-T-02CPT. (SJB)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Twelfth Judicial Circuit in and for Sarasota County, Florida, case number 2019 CA 003180 NC filed in State Court on June 9, 2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15672055 filed by OK Program, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Affidavit Declaration of Donald Northcross)(Axelman, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ambulatory Services Corporation v. Wilson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Wilson
Represented By: Janelle Alicia Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OK Program, Inc.
Represented By: David Axelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ambulatory Services Corporation
Represented By: Howard Poznanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?