Carreon v. Bank of America Corporation Corporate Benefits Committee et al
Plaintiff: Maria Carreon
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation Corporate Benefits Committee and Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv01677
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Demas, William)
September 5, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Bank of America Corporation Corporate Benefits Committee, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Metlife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company; Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent Bank of America, N.A. for Bank of America Corporation Corporate Benefits Committee.. (Jacobson, Jeannine)
September 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bank of America Corporation Corporate Benefits Committee, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Related case(s): no (Jacobson, Jeannine)
August 8, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Maria Carreon. (Demas, William)
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Maria Carreon. Related case(s): no (Demas, William)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Telephonically. The parties may conduct their case management conference telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 8/8/2019. (NCR)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's answer to Plaintiff's complaint is due 9/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 8/8/2019. (NCR)
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference by All Defendants. (Jacobson, Jeannine) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Jacobson, Jeannine) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER of service returned executed on July 31, 2019 by Maria Carreon as to Bank of America Corporation Corporate Benefits Committee. (Demas, William)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on July 24, 2019 by Maria Carreon as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Demas, William)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeannine Cline Jacobson on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Jacobson, Jeannine)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/6/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 7/23/2019. (BGS)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/6/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 7/23/2019. (BGS)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (DG)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with signature against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs.(Demas, William)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-1677-T-36SPF. (SJB)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank of America Corporation Corporate Benefits Committee, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15674756) filed by Maria Carreon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Text of Proposed Order Waiver to BOA, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B1, #6 Exhibit B2, #7 Exhibit B3, #8 Exhibit B4)(Demas, William) COUNSEL DID NOT SIGN COMPLAINT. Modified on 7/11/2019 (DG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carreon v. Bank of America Corporation Corporate Benefits Committee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation Corporate Benefits Committee
Represented By: Jeannine Cline Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeannine Cline Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Carreon
Represented By: William Chris Demas
Represented By: John V. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?