Deputy et al v. Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Plaintiff: Diane L Deputy and James C. Deputy
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Not Yet Classified: Peter J. Grilli
Case Number: 8:2019cv01697
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER appointing Peter J. Grilli, Esq. as mediator in this action. The mediation conference is scheduled for January 22, 2020, at 9:30 AM. The Court directs that all counsel, parties, corporate representatives, and any other required claims professionals shall be present at the mediation conference with full authority to negotiate a settlement. The Court does not allow mediation by telephone or video conference. Personal attendance is required. See Local Rule 9.05(c). Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/23/2019. (SGM)
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 1/22/20 9:30 a.m. before Peter Grilli. (Stape, Maxwell)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER: On July 26, 2019, the Court entered its Case Management and Scheduling Order, directing Lead Counsel to file a notice of mediation within 21 days, or by August 16, 2019. (Doc. #7).A review of the docket reveals that no notice has been filed. Accordingly, Lead Counsel is directed to file a notice of mediation, indicating the date, time, and location of the mediation conference, by August 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/19/2019. (SGM)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Case management and scheduling order by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Service Group, Inc. for Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest.. (Stape, Maxwell)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Diane L Deputy, James C. Deputy. Related case(s): no (BES)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of lis pendens by Diane L Deputy, James C. Deputy (Gionet, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/5/2019 DOCUMENT TERMINATED, wrong event used, refiled at #11 Notice of Pendency (BES).
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Diane L Deputy, James C. Deputy. (Gionet, Jeffrey)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER: In light of the Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order (Doc. #7), no case management hearing will be held. Additionally, in order to keep cases moving on track, the Court has found it necessary to impose some restrictions on the types and number of extensions to case management deadlines that it grants. Thus, the parties are advised that, while short extensions, especially if unopposed, will be favorably considered, the Court will not substantially move the dispositive motions deadline or the trial date. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/26/2019. (TWL)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/2020 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Jury Trial set for the August 2020 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Conduct mediation hearing by 2/21/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/26/2019. (TWL)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/26/2019. (TWL)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Stape, Maxwell)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest.(Stape, Maxwell)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by July 30, 2019, file a completed Case Management Report. This document can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that the Court's Case Management Report form is different from those used by other judges. Local Rule 3.05(c)(2)(E), M.D. Fla., explains that most track two cases, like the present case, "will be tried within one year after the filing of the complaint." To accomplish this goal, the Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery. If the parties believe that more time than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. The Court will then determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/16/2019. (DLB)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:19-cv-1697-T-33JSS. (SJB)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thirteenth Judicial Circuit Court, case number 19-CA-004969 filed in State Court on May 10, 2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15682623 filed by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Part of Exhibit 4 to Notice of Removal, #2 State Court Docket Sheet Part of Exhibit 4 to Notice of Removal, #3 State Court Other Documents Part of Exhibit 4 to Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Maxwell H. Stape, Esquire in Support of Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit 2 - Defendants First Interrogatory to Plaintiffs (Deputy), #7 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Answers to Defendant's Initial Interrogatories)(Stape, Maxwell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deputy et al v. Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Represented By: Maxwell Harrison Stape
Represented By: Troy J. Seibert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane L Deputy
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Gionet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C. Deputy
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Gionet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Peter J. Grilli
Represented By: Peter John Grilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?