Pitts v. Tamko Building Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Adam Pitts
Defendant: Tamko Building Products, Inc., Beazer East, Inc., Bird Corporation, Chevron USA, Inc., Certain-Teed Corporation and Union Carbide Corporation
Case Number: 8:2019cv01707
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James S Moody
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to remand to Circuit Court of the 13th Judicial Circuit In and For Hillsborough County, FL filed by Tamko Building Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(St. Clair, Madeline) Modified text on 8/27/2019 (BSN).
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to remand to Circuit Court of the 13th Judicial Circuit In and For Hillsborough County, FL by Adam Pitts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(Vinocur, Rebecca) Modified text on 8/12/2019 (BSN).
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice by Adam Pitts. (Vinocur, Rebecca)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Adam Pitts. Related case(s): NO (Vinocur, Rebecca)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Tamko Building Products, Inc. (St. Clair, Madeline)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Tamko Building Products, Inc. Related case(s): yes (St. Clair, Madeline)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 7/19/2019. (SMB)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:19-cv-1707-T-30AAS. (SJB)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hillsborough County Court, case number 18-CA-007921 filed in State Court on 8/15/2018. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15689065 filed by Tamko Building Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 State Court COMPLAINT, #6 State Court Docket Sheet, #7 State Court ANSWER)(St. Clair, Madeline) Modified text on 7/16/2019 (BSN).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pitts v. Tamko Building Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamko Building Products, Inc.
Represented By: Madeline Corinne St. Clair
Represented By: Scott Parker Yount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beazer East, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bird Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain-Teed Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Pitts
Represented By: Rebecca S. Vinocur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?