Lusby et al v. Hyundai Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Hurt, William Lusby and Martha Orme
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Company, Hyundai Motor America, Kia Motors America, Inc. and Kia Motors Corporation
Case Number: 8:2019cv01735
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting the unopposed motion for extension of time to file motion for class certification. (Doc. #17). The Court will set a deadline to file any motions for class certification in the Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/3/2019. (DMD)
September 3, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Class Certification by All Plaintiffs. (Jeeves, Scott)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #13 plaintiff's motion for Charles J. LaDuca to appear pro hac vice; granting #14 plaintiff's motion for Michael J. Flannery to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 8/28/2019. (DMS)
August 26, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by William Lusby. (Jeeves, Scott)
August 26, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Michael J. Flannery, appearing on behalf of Dennis Hurt, William Lusby, Martha Orme (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA057898.) Related document: #14 MOTION for Michael J. Flannery to appear pro hac vice. (WCD)
August 26, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Charles J. LaDuca, appearing on behalf of Dennis Hurt, William Lusby, Martha Orme (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA057900.) Related document: #13 MOTION for Charles J. LaDuca to appear pro hac vice. (WCD)
August 23, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by William Lusby. Related case(s): Yes (Jeeves, Scott)
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Michael J. Flannery to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Warren, Alexandra) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Charles J. LaDuca to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Warren, Alexandra) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by October 29, 2019, file a completed Case Management Report. This document can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that the Court's Case Management Report form is different from those used by other judges. Local Rule 3.05(c)(2)(E), M.D. Fla., explains that most track two cases, like the present case, "will be tried within one year after the filing of the complaint." To accomplish this goal, the Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery. If the parties believe that more time than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. The Court will then determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/20/2019. (DMD)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting the unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to the Complaint. (Doc. #8). Based on the agreement of the parties as outlined in the motion, Defendants' response to the Complaint is now due October 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/20/2019. (DMD)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Hyundai Motor America and Hyundai Motor Company by Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company. (Hosley, Frank)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement for Kia Motors America, Inc. and Kia Motors Corporation by Kia Motors America, Inc., Kia Motors Corporation. (Hosley, Frank)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to Respond to Complaint by Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company, Kia Motors America, Inc., Kia Motors Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Hosley, Frank)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank D. Hosley on behalf of Hyundai Motor America, Kia Motors America, Inc. (Hosley, Frank)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/30/2019. (TWL)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/30/2019. (TWL)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company, Kia Motors America, Inc., Kia Motors Corporation. (BES)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Dennis Hurt, William Lusby, Martha Orme. (Jeeves, Scott)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:19-cv-1735-T-33TGW. (SJB)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15699446) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Jeeves, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lusby et al v. Hyundai Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Hurt
Represented By: Scott R. Jeeves
Represented By: Charles J. LaDuca
Represented By: Craig E. Rothburd
Represented By: Michael J. Flannery
Represented By: Alexandra Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Lusby
Represented By: Scott R. Jeeves
Represented By: Charles J. LaDuca
Represented By: Craig E. Rothburd
Represented By: Michael J. Flannery
Represented By: Alexandra Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Orme
Represented By: Scott R. Jeeves
Represented By: Charles J. LaDuca
Represented By: Craig E. Rothburd
Represented By: Michael J. Flannery
Represented By: Alexandra Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America
Represented By: Frank D. Hosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Motors America, Inc.
Represented By: Frank D. Hosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Motors Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?