Hyde v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Debbie Lee Hyde
Defendant: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security and Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 8:2019cv01738
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: William F Jung
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF of service by Debbie Lee Hyde as to Attorney General. (Pierre Pierre, Eddy)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF of service by Debbie Lee Hyde as to Regional Counsel. (Pierre Pierre, Eddy)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Debbie Lee Hyde. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/6/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 summons executed with proof of service)(Pierre Pierre, Eddy)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Debbie Lee Hyde. Related case(s): NO (Pierre Pierre, Eddy)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 7/19/2019. (SAO)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway. (BES)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (BES)
July 18, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-1738-T-02SPF. (SJB)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Debbie Lee Hyde against Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15700309) filed by Debbie Lee Hyde. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Pierre Pierre, Eddy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyde v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Lee Hyde
Represented By: Eddy Pierre Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?