Scanland v. Metlife Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sarah J Scanland and Sarah J. Scanland
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metlife Group, Inc. and MetLife
Not Yet Classified: Peter J. Grilli and Mark Hanley
Case Number: 8:2019cv01828
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on February 13, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. before Peter J. Grilli. (Taylor, Robert)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER appointing Peter J. Grilli, Esq. as mediator in this action. The mediation conference is scheduled for February 13, 2020, at 10:00 AM. The Court directs that all counsel, parties, corporate representatives, and any other required claims professionals shall be present at the mediation conference with full authority to negotiate a settlement. The Court does not allow mediation by telephone or video conference. Personal attendance is required. See Local Rule 9.05(c). Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/18/2019. (MWS)
September 18, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE re 16 Order To Show Cause by Sarah J. Scanland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email thread dated 9/17/19 and Notice of Mediation)(Taylor, Robert)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER: On September 4, 2019, the Court entered an Order appointing Peter Grilli as mediator in this case and directing Scanland to file a Notice of Mediation by September 11, 2019. (Doc. # 14). After Scanland failed to file the Notice of Mediation by that date, the Court entered another Order directing her to file the Notice of Mediation by September 16, 2019. (Doc. # 15). However, that deadline has now passed, and Scanland still has not filed the Notice of Mediation. Accordingly, Scanland is directed to show cause by September 20, 2019, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Local Rule 3.10(a). Failure to do so may result in this action being dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/17/2019. (MWS)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER: On September 4, 2019, the Court entered an Order appointing Peter Grilli as mediator in this case and directing Scanland to file a Notice of Mediation by September 11, 2019. (Doc. # 14). A review of the docket reveals that no notice has been filed. Accordingly, Scanland is directed to file a Notice of Mediation, including the date, time, and location of the mediation conference, by September 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/12/2019. (MWS)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER: In its August 14, 2019, Case Management and Scheduling Order, the Court appointed Mark Hanley, Esq. as mediator. (Doc. #11). However, Mr. Hanley subsequently declined his appointment due to a conflict of interest. (Doc. #13). Accordingly, the Court appoints Peter Grilli, Esq. as mediator in this case. Designated Lead Counsel shall contact opposing counsel and the mediator to reserve a conference date and shall file a notice with the Court by September 11, 2019, advising of the date and time of the mediation conference. The February 25, 2020, mediation deadline previously imposed by the Court remains in effect. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/4/2019. (MWS)
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Mark Hanley Declining Court-Appointed Mediation. (Hanley, Mark)
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Sarah J. Scanland. Related case(s): no (Taylor, Robert)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/2020 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Jury Trial set for August 2020 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Conduct mediation hearing by 2/25/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/14/2019. (MWS)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Metlife Group, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Harris, Monica)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Harris, Monica)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Metlife Group, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Harris, Monica)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER: Defendants' motion for extension of time to respond to the Complaint is granted. (Doc. #6). The response to the Complaint is now due August 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/2/2019. (MWS)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal, #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal by Metlife Group, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Harris, Monica)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal by Metlife Group, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Harris, Monica)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/30/2019. (TWL)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by August 12, 2019, file a completed Case Management Report. This document can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that the Court's Case Management Report form is different from those used by other judges. Local Rule 3.05(c)(2)(E), M.D. Fla., explains that most track two cases, like the present case, "will be tried within one year after the filing of the complaint." To accomplish this goal, the Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery. If the parties believe that more time than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. The Court will then determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/29/2019. (MWS)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:19-cv-1828-T-33AEP. (SJB)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thirteenth Judicial Circuit in and for Hillsborough County, Florida, case number 19-CA-003316 filed in State Court on 03/29/2019. (Filing Fee $400, Receipt # Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15735313) filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 State Court COMPLAINT, #6 State Court Docket Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 State Court Other Documents, #9 Exhibit to state complaint, #10 Exhibit to state complaint)(Harris, Monica) Modified on 7/26/2019 to correct docket text (SJB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scanland v. Metlife Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Monica Williams Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metlife Group, Inc.
Represented By: Monica Williams Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MetLife
Represented By: Monica Williams Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah J Scanland
Represented By: Robert E. Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah J. Scanland
Represented By: Robert E. Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Peter J. Grilli
Represented By: Peter John Grilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Mark Hanley
Represented By: Mark A. Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?