Koehn v. Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Wanda Koehn
Defendant: Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01832
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntary Dismissal of Complaint Without Prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) by Wanda Koehn. (Attachments: #1 A)(Hannah, Roderick)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 08/02/2019 by Wanda Koehn as to Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc.. (Duran, Pelayo)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Illitch Holdings, Inc. for Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc... (Bellido, Nelson)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Bellido, Nelson)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ADA ORDER. Status Conference set for JANUARY 30, 2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Thomas P. Barber. Courtroom to be determined. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 7/31/2019. (SRC)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. issued by Deputy Clerk on 7/31/2019. (SRC)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. (LD)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:19-cv-1832-T-60CPT. (SJB)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15735779) filed by Wanda Koehn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Summons)(Hannah, Roderick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koehn v. Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Nelson C. Bellido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Koehn
Represented By: Roderick Victor Hannah
Represented By: Pelayo M. Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?