Ebeh v. Florida Department of Revenue et al
Plaintiff: Hope Ebeh
Defendant: Florida Department of Revenue, Nadia Daughtery, Don Hall, Gloria Demedio and Mr. Boone
Case Number: 8:2019cv01859
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Reconsideration and objections to the Court's #10 Order on motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency. by Hope Ebeh. (AG)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ruling deferred #8 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency. Plaintiff is directed to file an amended complaint by 9/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 8/16/2019. (BEE)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER finding as moot #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis, per #8 motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 8/16/2019. (BEE)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Hope Ebeh. (LNR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Redacted Exhibit by Hope Ebeh (BES)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ruling deferred #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 8/6/2019. (Attachment: (1) affidavit of indigency form)(BEE)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 8/2/2019. (SRC)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENDORSED ORDER: On July 30, 2019, plaintiff Hope Ebeh filed a document entitled "Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support," along with an accompanying exhibit. (Dkt. #3). However, the exhibit includes personal identifying information of a minor, specifically his name and birthdate. (Dkt. # [3-1]). Therefore, the Clerk is directed to strike the Motion's exhibit. Plaintiff may refile this exhibit after thoroughly reviewing it to ensure it does not contain any personal identifying information. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 7/31/2019. (ANL)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 EMERGENCY MOTION for preliminary injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support by Hope Ebeh. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (STRICKEN and Returned per Court's 4 Order))(LNR) Modified text on 8/1/2019 (AG).
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Hope Ebeh. (LNR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Preliminary Injunction against All Defendants filed by Hope Ebeh.(LNR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ebeh v. Florida Department of Revenue et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nadia Daughtery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Demedio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hope Ebeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?