Wilson v. City of St. Petersburg et al
Plaintiff: Dwight Wilson
Defendant: Gary Cornwell, Claude Tankersley and City of St. Petersburg
Case Number: 8:2019cv01868
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Sean P Flynn
2 Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Martin, Danielle)
August 19, 2019 Filing 16 Third MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Dwight Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Printy, Gary)
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Dwight Wilson. Related case(s): no (Printy, Gary)
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Dwight Wilson. (Printy, Gary)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Joint Motion to Allow Parties to Conduct Case Management Conference by Telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 8/13/2019. (CKR)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Appear Telephonically to Conduct Case Management Conference by Dwight Wilson. (Printy, Gary) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim and Memorandum of Law by City of St. Petersburg, Gary Cornwell, Claude Tankersley. (Martin, Danielle)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to Judge Thomas P. Barber. New case number: 8:19-cv-1868-T-60SPF. (JNB)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER of Recusal. The Clerk shall reassign this case to the next available District Judge. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/2/2019. (BGS)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by City of St. Petersburg, Gary Cornwell, Claude Tankersley. (Martin, Danielle)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by City of St. Petersburg, Gary Cornwell, Claude Tankersley. Related case(s): no (Martin, Danielle)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Amended Notice of Appearance by Joseph P. Patner on behalf of City of St. Petersburg, Gary Cornwell, Claude Tankersley (Patner, Joseph)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph P. Patner on behalf of City of St. Petersburg, Gary Cornwell, Claude Tankersley (Patner, Joseph)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/15/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/1/2019. (BGS)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/15/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/1/2019. (BGS)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-1868-T-36SPF. (SJB)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pinellas County Circuit Civil, case number 18-CI-3908 filed in State Court on 06/12/2018. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15748410 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents Part 1 - State Pleadings, #5 State Court Other Documents Part 2 - State Pleadings)(Martin, Danielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. City of St. Petersburg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Cornwell
Represented By: Danielle Sheree Martin
Represented By: Joseph P. Patner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claude Tankersley
Represented By: Danielle Sheree Martin
Represented By: Joseph P. Patner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of St. Petersburg
Represented By: Danielle Sheree Martin
Represented By: Joseph P. Patner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Wilson
Represented By: Gary L. Printy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?