Ayala v. Farias et al
Plaintiff: Alexi Ayala
Defendant: South East Personnel Leasing, Inc., Joanna Farias and Tampabay Framing LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv01878
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to extend time to conduct Case Management Conference by Alexi Ayala. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavits of Service)(Smith, Donna) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #12 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant South East Personnel Leasing, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Plaintiff shall have up to and including October 11, 2019 to respond to Defendant South East Personnel Leasing, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/27/2019. (APF)
September 26, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by Alexi Ayala. (Smith, Donna)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #12 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant South East Personnel Leasing, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Plaintiff shall have up to and including September 27, 2019 to respond to Defendant South East Personnel Leasing, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/5/2019. (APF)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by Alexi Ayala. (Smith, Donna)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by South East Personnel Leasing, Inc. (Ruiz, Fabian) Modified text on 8/29/2019 (JNB).
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey K. Jaensch on behalf of South East Personnel Leasing, Inc. (Jaensch, Tracey)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by South East Personnel Leasing, Inc.. (Ruiz, Fabian)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by South East Personnel Leasing, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Ruiz, Fabian)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Alexi Ayala. Related case(s): n (Smith, Donna)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Alexi Ayala. (Smith, Donna)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Joanna Farias, South East Personnel Leasing, Inc., Tampabay Framing LLC. (AG)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/15/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/1/2019. (JCG)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/15/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/1/2019. (JCG)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:19-cv-1878-T-35JSS. (SJB)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joanna Farias, South East Personnel Leasing, Inc., Tampabay Framing LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15750824) filed by Alexi Ayala. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Smith, Donna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayala v. Farias et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South East Personnel Leasing, Inc.
Represented By: Fabian A. Ruiz
Represented By: Tracey K. Jaensch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanna Farias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tampabay Framing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexi Ayala
Represented By: Donna V. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?