Sunshine State USA, LLC et al v. Baran et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Gail Mc Hardy, N M, Sunshine State USA, LLC, Ian Lamond Mc Hardy, Jordan Russell Mc Hardy and J M
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), Director Kathy A Baran, Acting Secretary Kevin K. McAleenan, Acting Director Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kathy A Baran, Kevin K. McAleenan and Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Case Number: 8:2019cv01909
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), United States Department of Homeland Security. (BSN)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned unexecuted by N M, Deborah Gail Mc Hardy, Ian Lamond Mc Hardy, Jordan Russell Mc Hardy, Sunshine State USA, LLC, J M as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS). (Attachments: #1 Supplement Unexecuted Summons (USCIS))(Solowsky, Danni)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED summons to be issued by J M, N M, Deborah Gail Mc Hardy, Ian Lamond Mc Hardy, Jordan Russell Mc Hardy, Sunshine State USA, LLC. (Solowsky, Danni)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 TERMINATED. SUMMONS returned unexecuted by N M, Deborah Gail Mc Hardy, Ian Lamond Mc Hardy, Jordan Russell Mc Hardy, Sunshine State USA, LLC, J M as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS). (Solowsky, Danni) NOTE: Incomplete Proof of Service, counsel notified. Modified on 8/22/2019 (LD).
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by J M, N M, Deborah Gail Mc Hardy, Ian Lamond Mc Hardy, Jordan Russell Mc Hardy, Sunshine State USA, LLC. Related case(s): no (Solowsky, Danni)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/20/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/6/2019. (JCG)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Kathy A Baran, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS). (LD)
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:19-cv-1909-T-35AEP. (SJB)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory And Injunctive Relief against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15762833) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summonses (1 of 1), #2 Civil Cover (1 of 1), #3 Exhibit Index (1 of 1), #4 Exhibit A (1 of 8), #5 Exhibit A (2 of 8), #6 Exhibit A (3 of 8), #7 Exhibit A (4 of 8), #8 Exhibit A (5 of 8), #9 Exhibit A (6 of 8), #10 Exhibit A (7 of 8), #11 Exhibit A (8 of 8), #12 Exhibit B (1 of 1), #13 Exhibit C (1 of 1), #14 Exhibit D (1 of 1), #15 Exhibit E (1 of 12), #16 Exhibit E (2 of 12), #17 Exhibit E (3 of 12), #18 Exhibit E (4 of 12), #19 Exhibit E (5 of 12), #20 Exhibit E (6 of 12), #21 Exhibit E (7 of 12), #22 Exhibit E (8 of 12), #23 Exhibit E (9 of 12), #24 Exhibit E (10 of 12), #25 Exhibit E (11 of 12), #26 Exhibit E (12 of 12), #27 Exhibit F (1 of 1), #28 Exhibit G (1 of 1), #29 Exhibit H (1 of 1), #30 Exhibit I (1 of 1))(Solowsky, Danni) Modified on 8/5/2019 (LD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sunshine State USA, LLC et al v. Baran et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Kathy A Baran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Kevin K. McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy A Baran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Gail Mc Hardy
Represented By: Danni Brancaccio Solowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N M
Represented By: Danni Brancaccio Solowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunshine State USA, LLC
Represented By: Danni Brancaccio Solowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Lamond Mc Hardy
Represented By: Danni Brancaccio Solowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Russell Mc Hardy
Represented By: Danni Brancaccio Solowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J M
Represented By: Danni Brancaccio Solowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?