Loyd v. Waypoint Resource Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jay Loyd
Defendant: Waypoint Resource Group, LLC and Equifax Information Services, LLC
Not Yet Classified: Peter J. Grilli
Case Number: 8:2019cv01911
Filed: August 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Sean P Flynn
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Waypoint Resource Group, LLC.(Borucke, David)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER appointing Peter J. Grilli, Esq. as mediator in this action. The mediation conference is scheduled for November 12, 2019, at 9:30 AM. The Court directs that all counsel, parties, corporate representatives, and any other required claims professionals shall be present at the mediation conference with full authority to negotiate a settlement. The Court does not allow mediation by telephone or video conference. Personal attendance is required. See Local Rule 9.05(c). Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/3/2019. (MWS)
September 3, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on November 12, 2019 at 9:30 AM before Peter J. Grilli. (Geiger, Bryan)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER: Defendant Waypoint Resource Group, LLC's unopposed motion for extension of time is granted. (Doc. #11). Waypoint's response to the Complaint is now due September 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/30/2019. (MWS)
August 28, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Jay Loyd. (Geiger, Bryan)
August 28, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Love, John)
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Related case(s): no (Love, John)
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Love, John)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Waypoint Resource Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Trellis Company, Other Affiliate Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A., Other Affiliate David C. Borucke, Other Affiliate Equifax Information Services LLC, Other Affiliate Trellis Holdings, Inc, Other Affiliate Jay Loyd, Other Affiliate Bryan J Geiger, Other Affiliate Seraph Legal, P.A. for Waypoint Resource Group, LLC. (Borucke, David)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Waypoint Resource Group, LLC. (Borucke, David)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Borucke on behalf of Waypoint Resource Group, LLC. (Borucke, David)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties are directed to adhere to the Court's Scheduling Order. This action is hereby referred to Peter J. Grilli, Esq., for mediation. The parties must mediate no later than November 26, 2019. Lead Counsel shall file a notice of mediation informing the Court as to the date, time, and location of mediation by September 12, 2019. Neither party may reschedule or cancel the mediation conference once it is set; leave of Court must be obtained before the mediation conference may be rescheduled or cancelled. The parties shall not mediate until the information exchange outlined in the Scheduling Order is completed. Absent compelling circumstances and leave of Court, lead counsel must appear at the mediation conference. Lead Counsel shall file a notice informing the Court as to the results of mediation within 24 hours of the mediation conference. In the event mediation results in an impasse, the parties must file their jointly-prepared fast-track case management report within 24 hours of the mediation conference. Upon review of the jointly-prepared case management report, the Court will determine whether a case management hearing is necessary. If a case management hearing is necessitated, the Court will set the hearing by separate notice. Furthermore, if mediation results in an impasse, the Court intends to schedule this action for trial within 90-120 days from the mediation conference. ORDER Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/16/2019. (TWL)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jay Loyd. Related case(s): no (Geiger, Bryan)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on August 7, 2019 by Jay Loyd as to Waypoint Resource Group, LLC. (Geiger, Bryan)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on August 7, 2019 by Jay Loyd as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Geiger, Bryan)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/6/2019. (TWL)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/6/2019. (TWL)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Waypoint Resource Group, LLC. (LNR)
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-1911-T-33SPF. (SJB)
August 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15762941) filed by Jay Loyd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons)(Geiger, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loyd v. Waypoint Resource Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waypoint Resource Group, LLC
Represented By: David C. Borucke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: John Anthony Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Loyd
Represented By: Bryan James Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Peter J. Grilli
Represented By: Peter John Grilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?