Stemrad, Ltd. et al v. Lask
Plaintiff: Stemrad, Inc. and Stemrad, Ltd.
Defendant: Assaf Lask
Case Number: 8:2019cv01947
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Stemrad, Inc., Stemrad, Ltd. identifying Other Affiliate AIH-StemRad LLC, Other Affiliate Wanaka Capital Ltd, Other Affiliate BZGS Holdings LLC for Stemrad, Inc., Stemrad, Ltd... (Stein, Stefan)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Stemrad, Inc., Stemrad, Ltd.. Related case(s): No (Stein, Stefan)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Assaf Lask. (CTR)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Stemrad, Inc., Stemrad, Ltd.. (Stein, Stefan)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/21/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/7/2019. (BGS)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/21/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/7/2019. (BGS)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:19-cv-1947-T-36AAS. (SJB)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Assaf Lask (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15773978) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet)(Stein, Stefan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stemrad, Ltd. et al v. Lask
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stemrad, Inc.
Represented By: Stefan Vaughn Stein
Represented By: Cole Carlson
Represented By: William Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stemrad, Ltd.
Represented By: Stefan Vaughn Stein
Represented By: Cole Carlson
Represented By: William Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assaf Lask
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?