CSX Transportation, Inc. v. Batts et al
Plaintiff: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Defendant: Kurt Herring, Jermell Batts and Jermell Lamont Batts
Not Yet Classified: Peter J. Grilli
Case Number: 8:2019cv02004
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/13/2020 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Jury Trial set for September 2020 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Conduct mediation hearing by 4/8/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/24/2019. (MWS)
September 23, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Timothy L Frey, appearing on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA058280.) Related document: #13 Second MOTION for Timothy L. Frey to appear pro hac vice. (TDC)
September 23, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #15 Case Management Report by Jermell Lamont Batts, Kurt Herring identifying Corporate Parent Jermell Lamont Batts for Jermell Lamont Batts, Kurt Herring. (Eves, Brian)
September 23, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by CSX Transportation, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CSX Corporation for CSX Transportation, Inc. (Frey, Timothy)
September 23, 2019 Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Frey, Timothy)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorney Timothy L. Frey may appear pro hac vice, subject to the requirement that counsel comply with the email registration requirements of Local Rule 2.01(d), M.D. Fla., within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 9/20/2019. (MLM)
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 Second MOTION for Timothy L. Frey to appear pro hac vice by CSX Transportation, Inc. (Rubenstein, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying without prejudice #11 motion to appear pro hac vice for failure to comply with Local Rule 2.02(a) and 3.01(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 9/19/2019. (MLM)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION for Timothy L. Frey to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Rubenstein, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 Defendants' ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Jermell Lamont Batts, Kurt Herring.(Eves, Brian)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by September 23, 2019, file a completed Case Management Report. This document can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that the Court's Case Management Report form is different from those used by other judges. Local Rule 3.05(c)(2)(E), M.D. Fla., explains that most track two cases, like the present case, "will be tried within one year after the filing of the complaint." To accomplish this goal, the Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery. If the parties believe that more time than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. The Court will then determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/21/2019. (MWS)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice, #5 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by CSX Transportation, Inc. Related case(s): No (Smith, Joshua)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 8/16/2019 by CSX Transportation, Inc. as to Kurt Herring. (Smith, Joshua)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 8/19/2019 by CSX Transportation, Inc. as to Jermell Lamont Batts. (Smith, Joshua)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/20/2019. (TWL)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/20/2019. (TWL)
August 16, 2019 FEES paid by CSX Transportation, Inc. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number TPA057762) (WCD)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Jermell Lamont Batts, Kurt Herring. (LNR)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:19-cv-2004-T-33AAS. (SJB)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jermell Batts, Kurt Herring filed by CSX Transportation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Jermell Lamont Batts, #3 Proposed Summons Kurt Herring)(Smith, Joshua) Modified on 8/14/2019 to correct docket text (SJB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CSX Transportation, Inc. v. Batts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Herring
Represented By: Brian A. Eves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jermell Batts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jermell Lamont Batts
Represented By: Brian A. Eves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua S Smith
Represented By: Timothy L. Frey
Represented By: Brian David Rubenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Peter J. Grilli
Represented By: Peter John Grilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?