Tampa Electric Company v. Remee Products Corp., et al
Plaintiff: Tampa Electric Company
Defendant: Remee Products Corp. and Anixter, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv02006
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James S Moody
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason L. Margolin on behalf of Anixter, Inc. (Margolin, Jason)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Improper Venue by Remee Products Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Remee Limited Product Warranty)(Savona, Therese)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Defendant Anixter, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant Anixter, Inc.'s answer or response is due by October 23, 2019. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 9/27/2019. (SMB)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Anixter, Inc. (Joughin, Leslie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 8/16/2019. (KAC)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Anixter, Inc., Remee Products Corp. (BSN)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:19-cv-2006-T-30JSS. (SJB)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15800651) filed by Tampa Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet #2 Exhibit A to Complaint, #3 Proposed Summons Anixter, #4 Proposed Summons Remee)(Chistolini, Paul) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (BSN).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tampa Electric Company v. Remee Products Corp., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tampa Electric Company
Represented By: Paul U. Chistolini
Represented By: Kimberly Ivonne Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remee Products Corp.
Represented By: Therese Ann Savona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anixter, Inc.
Represented By: Leslie E. Joughin, III
Represented By: Jason L. Margolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?