Leitzke v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Dusty Leitzke
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Not Yet Classified: Mark A. Hanley and Peter J. Grilli
Case Number: 8:2019cv02174
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER regarding motions for summary judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/28/2019. (TWL)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: See order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/28/2019. (TWL)
October 28, 2019 Filing 69 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Dusty Leitzke. (Meeks, Rowdy)
October 25, 2019 Filing 70 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 10/25/2019. Court Reporter: Linda Wolfe (TWL)
October 25, 2019 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. (Zelek, Mark)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Appear Telephonically at the Case Management Hearing (Doc. #63). Lead counsel for the Defendant, Sari Alamuddin, may appear telephonically at the October 25, 2019, case management hearing. Counsel is directed to call the reserved conference toll free number at 1-888-684-8852. The access code to enter the telephone conference is: 2564072 followed by the # (pound) key. Counsel will then be prompted to enter the participant security code, followed by the # (pound) key. This conference will be activated at 1:50 p.m. so the conference may start promptly at 2:00 p.m. EST. Counsel should contact courtroom deputy, Tamecika Lee at Tamecika_lee@flmd.uscourts.gov for the participant security code. Counsel is advised to use a landline in a quiet environment during the hearing. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/22/2019. (SGM)
October 22, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE by Dusty Leitzke re #30 Order of Issues (Meeks, Rowdy)
October 22, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. of Issues (Zelek, Mark)
October 22, 2019 Filing 64 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Zelek, Mark)
October 22, 2019 Filing 63 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Hearing, Or In The Alternative, Reschedule The Date Of The Case Management Hearing by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.. (Zelek, Mark)
October 21, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE by Dusty Leitzke re #30 Order Mediation Result (Meeks, Rowdy)
October 21, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of hearing: Case Management hearing set for 10/25/2019 at 2:00 PM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Absent compelling circumstances and leave of Court, Lead Counsel must appear in person at the Case Management Hearing. Lead Counsel must be prepared to discuss the claims and defenses as well as any unique aspects of the case with the Court. This hearing is an investment of the Court's time and presents an opportunity for Counsel to meet the judge presiding over their case as well as present any issues that should be called to the Court's attention.(TWL)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ENDORSED ORDER: This case did not resolve at mediation. Therefore, the Court believes that a case management hearing is in order. The Clerk is directed to schedule this matter for a hearing on October 25, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. The parties are reminded that, pursuant to the September 17, 2019, Scheduling Order, their jointly-prepared fast-track case management report is due tomorrow, October 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/21/2019. (SGM)
October 21, 2019 Filing 59 MEDIATION report Hearing held on October 21, 2019. Hearing outcome: The parties have reached an impasse. (Grilli, Peter)
October 17, 2019 Filing 58 VERIFIED summary by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. (Zelek, Mark)
October 14, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of compliance re #30 Order Production of Documents by Dusty Leitzke (Meeks, Rowdy)
October 14, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE by Dusty Leitzke re #30 Order Answers to Court's Interrogatories by Opt-In Plaintiff Rebecca Massicotte (Meeks, Rowdy)
October 14, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE by Dusty Leitzke re #30 Order Answers to Court's Interrogatories by Opt-In Plaintiff Ophelia Hawkins (Meeks, Rowdy)
October 14, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE by Dusty Leitzke re #30 Order Answers to Court's Interrogatories by Opt-In Plaintiff Eram Rashedi (Meeks, Rowdy)
October 14, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE by Dusty Leitzke re #30 Order Answers to Court's Interrogatories by Opt-In Plaintiff Duane Hudson (Meeks, Rowdy)
October 14, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE by Dusty Leitzke re #30 Order Answers to Court's Interrogatories by Opt-In Plaintiff Colette Maxwell (Meeks, Rowdy)
October 14, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE by Dusty Leitzke re #30 Order Answers to Court's Interrogatories by Opt-In Plaintiff Cheryl Gordon (Meeks, Rowdy)
October 14, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE by Dusty Leitzke re #30 Order Answers to Court's Interrogatories by Plaintiff Dusty Leitzke (Meeks, Rowdy)
October 1, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of compliance re 44 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice of Rowdy B. Meeks by Dusty Leitzke (Meeks, Rowdy)
October 1, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of compliance re 42 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice of Sari M. Alamuddin by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. (Zelek, Mark)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ENDORSED ORDER granting #36 #37 #38 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Hans A. Nilges, Robi J. Baishnab, and Shannon Marie Draher terminated as counsel of record for Plaintiff and relieved of any further responsibility in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 10/1/2019. (REE)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ENDORSED ORDER: On September 17, 2019, this Court entered its Scheduling Order in this case, directing that Plaintiff's Answers to the Court's Interrogatories be filed no later than October 17, 2019, and directing that Defendant's Verified Summary be filed no later than 15 days thereafter. (Doc. #30). The parties have now selected an October 21, 2019, mediation date before Peter J. Grilli, Esq. (Doc. #41). Pursuant to the Scheduling Order, the parties are not permitted to mediate until the information exchange outlined in the Order, including answers to interrogatories and the Verified Summary, has been completed. (Doc. # 30 at 3). Accordingly, to ensure that the parties have met the requirements of the Scheduling Order in advance of mediation, the Plaintiff's Answers to the Court's Interrogatories are now due on or before October 15, 2019, and Defendant's Verified Summary is now due on or before October 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/30/2019. (SGM)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER appointing Peter J. Grilli, Esq. as mediator in this action. The mediation conference is scheduled for October 21, 2019, at 1:30 PM. The Court directs that all counsel, parties, corporate representatives, and any other required claims professionals shall be present at the mediation conference with full authority to negotiate a settlement. The Court does not allow mediation by telephone or video conference. Personal attendance is required. See Local Rule 9.05(c). Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/30/2019. (SGM)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ENDORSED ORDER granting #40 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorney Rowdy B. Meeks may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff, with Attorney Gregg I. Shavitz designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 9/30/2019. (REE)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ENDORSED ORDER granting #35 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeffrey S. Dunlap and Alyson A. Terrell terminated as counsel of record for Defendant and relieved of any further responsibility in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 9/30/2019. (REE)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ENDORSED ORDER granting #34 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorney Sari M. Alamuddin may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant, with Attorney Mark E. Zelek designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 9/30/2019. (REE)
September 30, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on October 21, 2019 at 1:30 pm before Peter J. Grilli. (Meeks, Rowdy)
September 30, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Rowdy B. Meeks, appearing on behalf of Dusty Leitzke (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA058336.) Related document: #40 MOTION for Rowdy B. Meeks to appear pro hac vice. (TDC)
September 25, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Rowdy B. Meeks to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Shavitz, Gregg) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
September 25, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Dusty Leitzke (Shavitz, Gregg)
September 23, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Sari Alamuddin, appearing on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA058281.) Related document: #34 MOTION for Sari M. Alamuddin to appear pro hac vice. (TDC)
September 20, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Hans A. Nilges to withdraw as attorney by Dusty Leitzke. (BES) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
September 20, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Shannon M. Draher to withdraw as attorney by Dusty Leitzke. (BES) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
September 20, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Robi J. Baishnab to withdraw as attorney by Dusty Leitzke. (BES) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
September 20, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for to withdraw as attorney (Alyson A. Terrell and Jeffrey S. Dunlap) by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.. (Zelek, Mark) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
September 20, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for Sari M. Alamuddin to appear pro hac vice by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zelek, Mark) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
September 20, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark E. Zelek on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. (Zelek, Mark)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ENDORSED ORDER: In light of Mr. Hanley's conflict (Doc. #31), the parties are directed to mediate before Peter J. Grilli, Esq., by December 31, 2019. Plaintiff is directed to file a notice of mediation by October 3, 2019. All other directives in the Scheduling Order (Doc. #30) remain unchanged. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/18/2019. (SGM)
September 17, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE by Mark A. Hanley Declining Court-Appointed Mediation (Hanley, Mark)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties are directed to adhere to the Court's Scheduling Order. This action is hereby referred to Mark A. Hanley, Esq., for mediation. The parties must mediate no later than November 18, 2019. Lead Counsel shall file a notice of mediation informing the Court as to the date, time, and location of mediation by October 1, 2019. Neither party may reschedule or cancel the mediation conference once it is set; leave of Court must be obtained before the mediation conference may be rescheduled or cancelled. The parties shall not mediate until the information exchange outlined in the Scheduling Order is completed. Absent compelling circumstances and leave of Court, lead counsel must appear at the mediation conference. Lead Counsel shall file a notice informing the Court as to the results of mediation within 24 hours of the mediation conference. In the event mediation results in an impasse, the parties must file their jointly-prepared fast-track case management report within 24 hours of the mediation conference. Upon review of the jointly-prepared case management report, the Court will determine whether a case management hearing is necessary. If a case management hearing is necessitated, the Court will set the hearing by separate notice. Furthermore, if mediation results in an impasse, the Court intends to schedule this action for trial within 90-120 days from the mediation conference. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/17/2019. (TWL)
September 5, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE to counsel Robi J. Baishnab, Hans A. Nilges, Rowdy B. Meeks, Shannon Marie Draher, Alyson A. Terrell, Jeffrey S. Dunlap, Samuel Scott Shaulson, Sari M. Alamuddin, and Stephanie R. Reiss of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JNB)
September 5, 2019 Filing 28 TRANSFER IN from the Southern District of Ohio. Case assigned to District Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New Case Number: 8:19-cv-2174--T-33AEP. (JNB)
September 5, 2019 Filing 27 Case transferred in from District of Ohio Southern; Case Number 2:19-cv-02679. File received electronically
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #16 Defendant's Motion to Change Venue and denying as moot #24 the parties' Joint Motion to Stay Rule 26(f) Report and Cancel Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference. The Clerk is DIRECTED TO TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 9/4/19. (sem) [Transferred from ohsd on 9/5/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 25 Joint MOTION To Stay Rule 26(F) Report and Cancel Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Terrell, Alyson) [Transferred from ohsd on 9/5/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Plaintiff Dusty Leitzke. (Meeks, Rowdy) [Transferred from ohsd on 9/5/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTATION ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sam S. Shaulson. By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 8/29/2019. (ew) [Transferred from ohsd on 9/5/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7082786) of Sam S. Shaulson by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Terrell, Alyson) [Transferred from ohsd on 9/5/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTATION ORDER granting #19 and #20 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sari M. Alamuddin and Stephanie R. Reiss entered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 08/26/2019. (mdr) [Transferred from ohsd on 9/5/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7077876) of Stephanie R. Reiss by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Terrell, Alyson) [Transferred from ohsd on 9/5/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7077865) of Sari M. Alamuddin by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Terrell, Alyson) [Transferred from ohsd on 9/5/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co. identifying Corporate Parent JP Morgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A... (Terrell, Alyson) [Transferred from ohsd on 9/5/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Terrell, Alyson) [Transferred from ohsd on 9/5/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Change Venue by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Dejuan Taylor) (Terrell, Alyson) [Transferred from ohsd on 9/5/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2019 11:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln) [Transferred from ohsd on 9/5/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Reset deadlines pursuant to #14: Answer due 8/20/2019. (ew) [Transferred from ohsd on 9/5/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO MOVE OR PLEAD IN RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Terrell, Alyson) [Transferred from ohsd on 9/5/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyson A. Terrell and Jeffrey S. Dunlap for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Terrell, Alyson) Modified text on 7/31/2019 (ew). [Transferred from ohsd on 9/5/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Plaintiff Dusty Leitzke of Filing FLSA Opt-In Consent to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FLSA Consent to Join) (Meeks, Rowdy) [Transferred from ohsd on 9/5/2019.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Meeks, Rowdy) [Transferred from ohsd on 9/5/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (ew) [Transferred from ohsd on 9/5/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Plaintiff Dusty Leitzke of Filing FLSA Opt-In Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FLSA Consents to Join) (Meeks, Rowdy) [Transferred from ohsd on 9/5/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Meeks, Rowdy) [Transferred from ohsd on 9/5/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTATION ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rowdy B. Meeks. By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 7/2/2019. (ew) [Transferred from ohsd on 9/5/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6992191) of Rowdy B. Meeks by Plaintiff Dusty Leitzke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Baishnab, Robi) [Transferred from ohsd on 9/5/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Consent Form To Join In Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) by Plaintiff Dusty Leitzke (Attachments: #1 Consent of Duane Hudson, #2 Consent of Eram Rashedi, #3 Consent of Rebecca Massicotte) (Baishnab, Robi) Modified text on 6/28/2019 (kk2) [Transferred from ohsd on 9/5/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF NON ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS re #3 Request for Issuance of Summons by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio (Attachments: #1 Summons Form) (kk2) [Transferred from ohsd on 9/5/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Baishnab, Robi) [Transferred from ohsd on 9/5/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF NON-ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio (Attachments: #1 Summons Form) (kk2) [Transferred from ohsd on 9/5/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6982975), filed by Dusty Leitzke. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form, #3 Exhibit A- Consent of Dusty Leitzke) (Baishnab, Robi) [Transferred from ohsd on 9/5/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leitzke v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Dunlap
Represented By: Alyson A. Terrell
Represented By: Stephanie R. Reiss
Represented By: Samuel Scott Shaulson
Represented By: Sari M. Alamuddin
Represented By: Mark E. Zelek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dusty Leitzke
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Robi J. Baishnab
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon Marie Draher
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Mark A. Hanley
Represented By: Mark A. Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Peter J. Grilli
Represented By: Peter John Grilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?