Reiterman v. Abid
Plaintiff: Michael Reiterman
Defendant: Farah Abid and Farah Ali Abid
Case Number: 8:2019cv02282
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 motion to take limited discovery to effectuate service of process. See order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 10/28/2019. (MLM)
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Discovery to Effectuate Service of Process by Michael Reiterman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Krista L. Baughman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Baughman, Krista) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
October 2, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Krista L. Baughman (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA058371.) Related document: #10 MOTION for Krista L. Baughman to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorney Krista L. Baughman may appear pro hac vice, subject to the requirement that counsel comply with the email registration requirements of Local Rule 2.01(d), M.D. Fla., within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 10/1/2019. (MLM)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Krista L. Baughman to appear pro hac vice by Michael Reiterman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Attorney, #2 Exhibit B - Attorney Designation)(Sarelson, Matthew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Michael Reiterman. Related case(s): yes (Sarelson, Matthew)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of counsel Certificate of Interested Parties by Matthew Seth Sarelson on behalf of Michael Reiterman (Sarelson, Matthew)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 9/17/2019. (SAO)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENDORSED ORDER directing the Clerk to place Exhibit A to the complaint under seal. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 9/16/2019. (CCB)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Farah Ali Abid. (BES)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Michael Reiterman. Related case(s): yes (Sarelson, Matthew)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:19-cv-228-T-02AAS. (SJB)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Farah Abid with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15914727) filed by Michael Reiterman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Private Investigator, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sarelson, Matthew) Modified per chambers on 9/13/2019 to remove image of Exhibit A. (KE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reiterman v. Abid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farah Abid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farah Ali Abid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Reiterman
Represented By: Matthew Seth Sarelson
Represented By: Krista L. Baughman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?