Government Employees Insurance Co. et al v. CHWR, LLC d/b/a Smart Ride Windshield Repair et al
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Co., Geico Indemnity Co., GEICO Casualty Co. and GEICO General Insurance Company
Defendant: CHWR, LLC d/b/a Smart Ride Windshield Repair, Andrew Baker, Stealing Home, LLC, Lawrence Tenebaum, Michael Meryash, Baumer Group, LLC, Rekaba LLC and Gerald Salko
Case Number: 8:2019cv02335
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN of service executed on 09/20/2019 by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., GEICO Casualty Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. as to Rekaba LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Rekaba, LLC)(Marino, John)
October 7, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 09/23/2019 by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., GEICO Casualty Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. as to Gerald Salko. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service on Gerald Salko)(Marino, John)
October 7, 2019 Filing 13 TERMINATED. RETURN of service executed on 09/20/2019 by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., GEICO Casualty Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. as to Rekaba LLC. (Marino, John) NOTE: Corrected document filed at Dkt. 15. Modified on 10/8/2019 (LD).
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 09/23/2019 by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., GEICO Casualty Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. as to Lawrence Tenebaum. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service on Larry Tenebaum)(Marino, John)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 09/20/2019 by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., GEICO Casualty Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. as to CHWR, LLC d/b/a Smart Ride Windshield Repair. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service on CHWR, Inc. dba Smart Ride Windshield Repair)(Marino, John)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 09/23/2019 by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., GEICO Casualty Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. as to Baumer Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Baumer Group, LLC)(Marino, John)
October 4, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Barry I. Levy, appearing on behalf of GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA058424.) Related document: #6 MOTION for Barry I. Levy to appear pro hac vice. (TDC)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Plaintiffs' Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on 10/4/2019. (BRC)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. Related case(s): n (Marino, John)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co... (Marino, John)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Barry I. Levy to appear pro hac vice by GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Admission Certification, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order)(Marino, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/10/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/26/2019. (JCG)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/10/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/26/2019. (JCG)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Andrew Baker, Baumer Group, LLC, CHWR, LLC d/b/a Smart Ride Windshield Repair, Michael Meryash, Rekaba LLC, Gerald Salko, Stealing Home, LLC. (LD)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:19-cv-2335-T-35JSS. (NAS)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15939935) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Marino, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Co. et al v. CHWR, LLC d/b/a Smart Ride Windshield Repair et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHWR, LLC d/b/a Smart Ride Windshield Repair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stealing Home, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Tenebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Meryash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baumer Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rekaba LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Salko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Co.
Represented By: John Patrick Marino
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geico Indemnity Co.
Represented By: John Patrick Marino
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Casualty Co.
Represented By: John Patrick Marino
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: John Patrick Marino
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?