JSON Ventures LLC v. Seaquake Partners LP et al
Plaintiff: JSON Ventures LLC
Defendant: Dylan Knight, Seaquake Partners LP, Seaquake Ink, Seaquake Manager LLC, Andrew Katz, Matthew Krueger and Seaquake, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv02365
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING #9 Amended Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff, JSON Ventures LLC. The Temporary Restraining Order issued by the Court on October 1, 2019, (Dkt. 12), is LIFTED. The case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to CLOSE the case. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/5/2019. (SBA)
November 4, 2019 Filing 25 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Mary S. Scriven: MOTION HEARING held on 11/4/2019 re #9 Emergency MOTION for temporary restraining order filed by JSON Ventures LLC. Court Reporter: David Collier (TWL)
November 1, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE by Andrew Katz, Matthew Krueger, Seaquake Manager LLC, Seaquake Partners LP, Seaquake, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cooper, Jude)
October 30, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by Andrew Katz, Matthew Krueger, Seaquake Manager LLC, Seaquake Partners LP, Seaquake, Inc. re #21 Response in Opposition to Motion for Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supplemental Affidavit of Andrew Katz)(Daneshfar, Yasin)
October 28, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 Emergency MOTION for temporary restraining order filed by Andrew Katz, Matthew Krueger, Seaquake Manager LLC, Seaquake Partners LP, Seaquake, Inc. (Daneshfar, Yasin) Modified text on 10/29/2019 (JNB).
October 28, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Andrew Katz, Matthew Krueger, Seaquake Manager LLC, Seaquake Partners LP, Seaquake, Inc. re 15 Order on motion for extension of time to answer (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Seaquake Partners LP, #2 Affidavit Seaquake, Inc., #3 Affidavit Seaquake Manager, LLC, #4 Affidavit Matthew Krueger)(Daneshfar, Yasin)
October 28, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Andrew Katz, Matthew Krueger, Seaquake Manager LLC, Seaquake Partners LP, Seaquake, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 1)(Daneshfar, Yasin)
October 28, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jude C. Cooper on behalf of Andrew Katz, Matthew Krueger, Seaquake Partners LP (Cooper, Jude)
October 28, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against JSON Ventures LLC with Jury Demand filed by JSON Ventures LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Berkman, Peter) Modified text on 10/29/2019 (JNB).
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Defendants Seaquake Inc. and Seaquake Manager, LLC. Defendants shall have up to and including November 12, 2019 to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/23/2019. (SBA)
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Seaquake Manager LLC, Seaquake, Inc. (Cooper, Jude) Modified event and text on 10/23/2019 (JNB).
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jude C. Cooper on behalf of Seaquake Manager LLC, Seaquake, Inc. (Cooper, Jude)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #9 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. The Temporary Restraining Order is effective immediately and will remain in effect through and including November 4, 2019 at 5:00 p.m. Eastern Time, unless extended in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(b)(2). This case is set for a hearing to determine whether to convert this temporary restraining order into a preliminary injunction on Monday, November 4, 2019, in the Sam Gibbons United States Courthouse, Tampa Florida, Courtroom 7A at 11:00 a.m. before United States District Judge Mary S. Scriven. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/21/2019. (SBA)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Ex Parte Hearing on #9 Plaintiff's Amended Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction set for October 17, 2019 at 2:00PM in Tampa Courtroom 7A before Judge Mary S. Scriven. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/16/2019.(SBA)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 Emergency MOTION for temporary restraining order by JSON Ventures LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit)(Berkman, Peter)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #7 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Jason Ventures, LLC. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/15/2019. (SBA)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 Emergency MOTION for temporary restraining order and Preliminary Injunction by JSON Ventures LLC. (Berkman, Peter)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/11/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/27/2019. (JCG)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/11/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/27/2019. (JCG)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Andrew Katz, Dylan Knight, Matthew Krueger, Seaquake Manager LLC, Seaquake Partners LP, Seaquake, Inc. (JNB)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:19-cv-2365-T-35CPT. (SJB)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by JSON Ventures LLC.(Berkman, Peter)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 ***TERMINATED; WRONG EVENT; COUNSEL REFILED; SEE DOC. #2***Case transferred in File received electronically, COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15949695) filed by JSON Ventures LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Berkman, Peter) Modified on 9/24/2019 (JNB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JSON Ventures LLC v. Seaquake Partners LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JSON Ventures LLC
Represented By: Peter Benjamin Berkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dylan Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seaquake Partners LP
Represented By: Jude C. Cooper
Represented By: Yasin Daneshfar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seaquake Ink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seaquake Manager LLC
Represented By: Jude C. Cooper
Represented By: Yasin Daneshfar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Katz
Represented By: Jude C. Cooper
Represented By: Yasin Daneshfar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Krueger
Represented By: Jude C. Cooper
Represented By: Yasin Daneshfar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seaquake, Inc.
Represented By: Jude C. Cooper
Represented By: Yasin Daneshfar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?