Thakkar v. Greenspoon Marder, P.A.
Appellee: Greenspoon Marder, P.A.
In Re: Nilhan Financial, LLC
Appellant: Chittranjan Thakkar
Case Number: 8:2019cv02368
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Appellant Brief (Doc. #12). Appellant's initial brief is due on or before December 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/21/2019. (SGM)
November 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellant Brief by Chittranjan Thakkar. (BES)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Appellant is directed to file its initial brief by November 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/22/2019. (SGM)
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of docketing bankruptcy record on appeal advising counsel to comply with Rule 8018. Notice of appeal filed in U.S. District Court on 09/24/2019. (BES)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT (document no. 526) of Motion Hearing held on August 22, 2019 before Judge Michael G. Williamson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Johnson Transcription Service,Telephone number 813-920-1466. (AG)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT (document no. 509) of Trial on Amended Objection to Claim No. 3 held on June 19, 2019 before Judge Michael G. Williamson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Johnson Transcription Service,Telephone number 813-920-1466. (AG)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT (document no. 508) of Trial on Objection to Claim No. 2 held on June 18, 2019 before Judge Michael G. Williamson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Johnson Transcription Service,Telephone number 813-920-1466. (AG)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: #1 Bankruptcy notice of appeal filed by Chittranjan Thakkar. (Attachments: #1 2 Notice of Appeal, #2 3 Order on Appeal 1, #3 4 Order on Appeal 2, #4 5 Appellant Designation Record and Statement of Issues, #5 6 - Public Docket, #6 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000238_Objection_to_Claim, #7 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000301_Response_to_Niloy_Thakkars_Objection_to_Claim_Number_2_Filed_by_Greenspoon_Marder_PA_Fi, #8 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000334_Joinder_to_Objections_to_Claims_Filed_by_Interested_Party_Chittranjan_Thakkar, #9 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000336_Order_Scheduling_Trial_on_Niloy_Thakkars_Objection_to_Claim_No_2_of_Greenspoon_Marder_P, #10 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000355_Witness_List_Trial_on_Niloy_Thakkers_Objection_to_Claim_No_2_Filed_by_R_Scott_Shuker_on, #11 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000380_Part_1_Proposed_Exhibits_ranging_from_1_to_8_9_documents_attached_filed_on_behalf_of_Greenspoon, #12 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000380_Part_2_Exhibit_1, #13 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000380_Part_3_Exhibit_2, #14 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000380_Part_4_Exhibit_3, #15 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000380_Part_5_Exhibit_4, #16 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000380_Part_6_Exhibit_5, #17 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000380_Part_7_Exhibit_6, #18 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000380_Part_8_Exhibit_7, #19 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000380_Part_9_Exhibit_8, #20 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000384_Notice_Rescheduling_Trial, #21 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000386_Notice_of_Appearance_and_Request_for_Notice_Filed_by_Michael_S_Hoffman_on_behalf_of_Intere, #22 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000387_Emergency_Motion_to_Reschedule_Hearing_On_Objections_to_Claim_Filed_by_Michael_S_Hoffman_o, #23 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000389_Response_to_in_Opposition_to_Equity_Security_Holder_Chittranjan_Thakkars_Motion_to_Contin, #24 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000391_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Michael_Hoffman, #25 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000392_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Michael_Hoffman, #26 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000393_Order_Granting_Motion_To_Reschedule_Hearing_--_No_additional_continuances_shall_be_granted, #27 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000396_Order_Scheduling_Trial_and_Related_Deadlines_on_Niloy_Thakkars_Objection_to_Claim_No_2_o, #28 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000426_Witness_List_for_Greenspoon_Marder_PA_for_Trial_on_Objection_to_Claim_No_2_Filed_by_R_S, #29 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000428_Witness_List_for_trial_Re_Greenspoon_Marder_PA, #30 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000433_Expedited_Motion_for_Leave_to_Withdraw_as_Counsel_as_to_Objection_to_Claims_of_Greenspoon, #31 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000442_Order_Granting_Motion_for_Leave_To_Withdraw_as_Counsel_Michael_S_Hoffman_is_authorized_to, #32 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000449_Joinder_to_Objection_to_Proof_of_Claim_2_filed_by_Greenspoon_Marder_PC, #33 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_1_Proposed_Exhibits_ranging_from_1_to_34_35_documents_attached_filed_on_behalf_of_Greenspoo, #34 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_2_Exhibit_1, #35 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_3_Exhibit_2, #36 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_4_Exhibit_3, #37 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_5_Exhibit_4, #38 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_6_Exhibit_5, #39 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_7_Exhibit_6, #40 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_8_Exhibit_7, #41 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_9_Exhibit_8, #42 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_10_Exhibit_9, #43 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_11_Exhibit_10, #44 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_12_Exhibit_11, #45 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_13_Exhibit_12, #46 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_14_Exhibit_13, #47 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_15_Exhibit_14, #48 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_16_Exhibit_15, #49 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_17_Exhibit_16, #50 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_18_Exhibit_17, #51 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_19_Exhibit_18, #52 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_20_Exhibit_19, #53 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_21_Exhibit_20, #54 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_22_Exhibit_21, #55 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_23_Exhibit_22, #56 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_24_Exhibit_23, #57 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_25_Exhibit_24, #58 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_26_Exhibit_25, #59 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_27_Exhibit_26, #60 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_28_Exhibit_27, #61 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_29_Exhibit_28, #62 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_30_Exhibit_29, #63 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_31_Exhibit_30, #64 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_32_Exhibit_31, #65 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_33_Exhibit_32, #66 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_34_Exhibit_33, #67 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000455_Part_35_Exhibit_34, #68 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000467_Notice_of_Filing_Greenspoon_Marder_PAs_Memorandum_of_Law_in_Support_of_its_Response_to_N, #69 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000471_Emergency_Motion_to_Reschedule_Hearing_On_and_REQUEST_for_Telephonic_Hearing_on_June_18_2, #70 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000472_Part_1_Proposed_Exhibits_ranging_from_8_to_8_2_documents_attached_filed_by_Chittranjan_Thakkar, #71 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000472_Part_2_Exhibit_8, #72 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000476_Exhibit_1_to_Emergency_Motion_to_Reschedule_Hearing_On_and_REQUEST_for_Telephonic_Hearing, #73 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000477_Exhibit_2_to_Emergency_Motion_to_Reschedule_Hearing_On_and_REQUEST_for_Telephonic_Hearing, #74 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000478_Exhibit_3_to_Emergency_Motion_to_Reschedule_Hearing_On_and_REQUEST_for_Telephonic_Hearing, #75 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000482_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Chittranjan_Thakkar_Scott_Shuker_for, #76 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000485_Annotated_Exhibit_List_of_Counsel_for_Greenspoon_Marder_PA_from_Hearing_Held_on_June_18, #77 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000495_Order_Denying_Motion_To_Reschedule_Hearing, #78 8-17-bk-03597_Docket_000500_Motion_for_Reconsideration_of_Order_Overruling_Objection_to_Claim, #79 Claim 2-1, #80 Claim 2-2)(JN)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Chittranjan Thakkar. Related case(s): yes (BES)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Greenspoon Marder, P.A. of Designation of Additional Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal (Shuker, R.)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Greenspoon Marder, P.A. Related case(s): Yes (Shuker, R.)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/25/2019. (TWL)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by Chittranjan Thakkar. Bankruptcy Court case number 8:17-bk-03597-MGW (DE 530). Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 09/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal)(BES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thakkar v. Greenspoon Marder, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Greenspoon Marder, P.A.
Represented By: R. Scott Shuker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Nilhan Financial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Chittranjan Thakkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?