Whitis v. Freedom Boat Club, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Alicia Whitis
Defendant: Glasstream Motor Vessel the M/V Reel Busy, II, Another Day in Paradise Boat Club, LLC, Freedom Boat Club, LLC, Freedom Marine Sales, LLC and M/V Reel Busy, II
Case Number: 8:2019cv02438
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 24 ***TERMINATED-IMAGE REMOVED AS DISCOVERY PER LOCAL RULE 3.03*** NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Alicia Whitis. Related case(s): no (Butler, Frank) Modified on 11/27/2019 (LSS). (LSS).
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER granting #21 Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Default. The Clerk's default entries are vacated. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 11/8/2019. (Jung, William)
November 7, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by Another Day in Paradise Boat Club, LLC, Freedom Boat Club, LLC, Freedom Marine Sales, LLC. (Bushway, Brandon)
November 7, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Set Aside Clerk's Defaults #17 Clerk's Entry of Default, #19 Clerk's Entry of Default, #18 Clerk's Entry of Default by Another Day in Paradise Boat Club, LLC, Freedom Boat Club, LLC, Freedom Marine Sales, LLC. (Bushway, Brandon)
November 7, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Freedom Boat Club, LLC, Freedom Marine Sales, LLC.(Bushway, Brandon)
November 6, 2019 Filing 19 ***SET ASIDE, pursuant to court's endorsed order 23.***Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Freedom Marine Sales, LLC. (LNR) Modified text on 11/12/2019 (LNR).
November 6, 2019 Filing 18 ***SET ASIDE, pursuant to court's endorsed order 23.***Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Another Day in Paradise Boat Club, LLC. (LNR) Modified text on 11/12/2019 (LNR).
November 6, 2019 Filing 17 ***SET ASIDE, pursuant to court's endorsed order 23.***Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Freedom Boat Club, LLC. (LNR) Modified text on 11/12/2019 (LNR).
November 6, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Another Day in Paradise Boat Club, LLC.(Massee, Jules)
November 6, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN of service executed on 10/08/2019 by Alicia Whitis as to Another Day in Paradise Boat Club, LLC. (Butler, Frank)
November 6, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 10/08/2019 by Alicia Whitis as to Freedom Boat Club, LLC. (Butler, Frank)
November 6, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 10/08/2019 by Alicia Whitis as to Freedom Marine Sales, LLC. (Butler, Frank)
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Freedom Boat Club, LLC by Alicia Whitis. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Butler, Frank) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Another Day in Paradise Boat Club, LLC by Alicia Whitis. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Butler, Frank) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Freedom Marine Sales, LLC by Alicia Whitis. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Butler, Frank) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 ***TERMINATED, contacted counsel to use proper event.***PROOF of service by Alicia Whitis (Butler, Frank) Modified text on 11/6/2019 (LNR).
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 ***TERMINATED, contacted counsel to use proper event.***PROOF of service by Alicia Whitis (Butler, Frank) Modified text on 11/6/2019 (LNR).
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 ***TERMINATED, contacted counsel to use proper event.***PROOF of service by Alicia Whitis (Butler, Frank) Modified text on 11/6/2019 (LNR).
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by Alicia Whitis. (Butler, Frank)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Alicia Whitis. Related case(s): No (Butler, Frank)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 10/3/2019. (SAO)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Another Day in Paradise Boat Club, LLC, Freedom Boat Club, LLC, Freedom Marine Sales, LLC. (BSN)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:19-cv-2438-T-02AEP. (SJB)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Another Day in Paradise Boat Club, LLC, Freedom Boat Club, LLC, Freedom Marine Sales, LLC, Glasstream Motor Vessel the M/V Reel Busy, II with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15981152) filed by Alicia Whitis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Another Day in Paradise Boat Club, LLC, #3 Proposed Summons Freedom Boat Club, LLC, #4 Proposed Summons Freedom Marine Sales, LLC)(Butler, Frank) Modified text on 10/2/2019 (BSN).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitis v. Freedom Boat Club, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glasstream Motor Vessel the M/V Reel Busy, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Another Day in Paradise Boat Club, LLC
Represented By: Brandon Bushway
Represented By: Jules Victor Massee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Boat Club, LLC
Represented By: Brandon Bushway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Marine Sales, LLC
Represented By: Brandon Bushway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Reel Busy, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Whitis
Represented By: Frank D. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?