Ngalamulume et al v. Sheehy et al
Plaintiff: Guillaume Ngalamulume and Guillaume Ngalamulume, a/g/o C.N.
Defendant: Timothy Sheehy
Case Number: 8:2019cv02443
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of compliance by Timothy Sheehy (Massamillo, Eugene)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of compliance by Timothy Sheehy (Eckert, Anthony)
November 5, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Eugene Massamillo, appearing on behalf of Timothy Sheehy (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA058796.) Related document: #7 MOTION for Eugene F. Massamillo to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
November 5, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Anthony Eckert, appearing on behalf of Timothy Sheehy (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA058796.) Related document: #8 MOTION for Anthony W. Eckert III to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #8 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorneys Eugene Massamillo and Anthony W. Eckert may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant, with Attorney Nicholas E. Pantelopoulos designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 10/30/2019. (JMF)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Anthony W. Eckert III to appear pro hac vice by Timothy Sheehy. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Pantelopoulos, Nicholas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Eugene F. Massamillo to appear pro hac vice by Timothy Sheehy. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Pantelopoulos, Nicholas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #5 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Timothy Sheehy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Email Exchange Leading to Call with Insurer to Confirm Consideration for Settlement Exchanged), #2 Exhibit B (Citizenship Information for Co-Defendants))(Pantelopoulos, Nicholas)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION to remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hovsepian, Joseph)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Timothy Sheehy.(Pantelopoulos, Nicholas)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 10/3/2019. (SRC)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:19-cv-2443-T-60AEP. (SJB)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for the Tenth Judicial Circuit, Polk County, case number 2019 CA 003226 filed in State Court on August 1, 2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15983950 filed by Timothy Sheehy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit A, #3 State Court Other Documents Exhibit B, #4 State Court Docket Sheet)(Pantelopoulos, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ngalamulume et al v. Sheehy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Sheehy
Represented By: Nicholas E. Pantelopoulos
Represented By: Eugene Massamillo
Represented By: Anthony W. Eckert, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillaume Ngalamulume
Represented By: Joseph John Hovsepian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillaume Ngalamulume, a/g/o C.N.
Represented By: Joseph John Hovsepian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?