Adamopoulos v. Government Employees Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Dimitrios Adamopoulos
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company and The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv02452
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Saul, Harold)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Dimitrios Adamopoulos and Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel (Lilly, Scott)
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Dimitrios Adamopoulos re #2 Related case order and track 2 notice Certificate of Service (Lilly, Scott)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Dimitrios Adamopoulos. Related case(s): yes (Lilly, Scott)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Interested persons order by Dimitrios Adamopoulos. (Lilly, Scott)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Interested persons order by The Standard Fire Insurance Company. (Mogg, Randall)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Notice of pendency of related cases 2019-CA-002358 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by The Standard Fire Insurance Company. Related case(s): yes (Mogg, Randall)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Government Employees Insurance Company. Related case(s): NO (Saul, Harold)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Government Employees Insurance Company. (Saul, Harold)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/29/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/15/2019. (MR)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/29/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/15/2019. (MR)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 6th Judicial Circuit for Pasco County, case number 2019-CA-002358 filed in State Court on 7/10/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA058397 filed by Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Other Documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(WCD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adamopoulos v. Government Employees Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dimitrios Adamopoulos
Represented By: Scott R. Lilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Harold Adam Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Randall Mogg
Represented By: Randall Thomas Mogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?