Corona et al v. The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Guevara, D. R., Magdalena Corona, K. M., L. T., Y. T. and U. T.
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, William O'Connor and FCA US LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv02483
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE to Motion re #28 First MOTION to Dismiss case filed by Magdalena Corona. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James H Hada)(Hada, James)
December 2, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company re #27 MOTION to stay discovery and Supporting Memorandum of Law (Richman, Scott)
November 26, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion re #27 MOTION to stay discovery and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Magdalena Corona. (Hada, James)
November 18, 2019 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #22 Response to motion FCA US LLC's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Consideration of FCA US' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by FCA US LLC. (Fee, Meredith)
November 18, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to remand to State Court , #24 MOTION to remand to State Court and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by FCA US LLC. (Fee, Meredith)
November 18, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE to Motion re #24 MOTION to remand to State Court filed by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Richman, Scott)
November 18, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Richman, Scott)
November 13, 2019 Filing 28 First MOTION to Dismiss case by William O'Connor. (Coton, Daniel)
November 12, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to stay discovery and Supporting Memorandum of Law by FCA US LLC. (Fee, Meredith) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
November 12, 2019 Filing 26 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Fee, Meredith)
November 5, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Magdalena Corona. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James H Hada)(Hada, James)
November 5, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to remand to State Court by Magdalena Corona. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James H Hada, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Hada, James)
November 4, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit James H Hada, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Hada, James)
November 4, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint or Alternatively, Motion for Final Summary Judgment filed by Magdalena Corona. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James H Hada)(Hada, James).
November 4, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Magdalena Corona. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Ourand, William) COUNSEL WHO ELECTRONICALLY SIGNED ITEM TO REFILE SAME USING HIS/HER PERSONAL ECF LOGIN AND PASSWORD. Modified on 11/5/2019 (DG).
November 4, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to remand to State Court by Magdalena Corona. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(Ourand, William) ITEM TO BE REFILED BY COUNSEL WHO ELECTRONICALLY SIGNED SAME USING HIS/HER PERSONAL ECF LOGIN AND PASSWORD. Modified on 11/5/2019 (DG).
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Hada may appear specially as counsel of record in this action. If counsel has not already done so, within 14 days hereof, he shall pay the $150 fee to the Clerk of Court and complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 10/30/2019. (AMM)
October 29, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for James H. Hada to appear pro hac vice by Magdalena Corona. (Melton, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
October 25, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney James H. Hada, appearing on behalf of Magdalena Corona (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA058684.). (TDC)
October 24, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of pendency of related cases Plaintiffs' Notice of Pendency of Other Actions per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Magdalena Corona. Related case(s): no (Melton, Robert)
October 23, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by FCA US LLC. Related case(s): No (Fee, Meredith)
October 21, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Mark Coton on behalf of William O'Connor (Coton, Daniel)
October 15, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. Related case(s): yes (Richman, Scott)
October 15, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Richman, Scott)
October 14, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint or Alternatively, Motion for Final Summary Judgment by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Blank, Robert)
October 14, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by FCA US LLC identifying Other Affiliate FCA North America Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate FIAT CHRYSLER AUTOMOBILES N.V., Other Affiliate FCA Holdco B.V., Other Affiliate Exor N.V. for FCA US LLC.. (Blank, Robert)
October 14, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Richman, Scott)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE to counsel James H. Hada of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DG)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7--notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/10/2019. (GSO)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Supplement Exhibit C)(Richman, Scott)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company re #1 Notice of Removal (Richman, Scott)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 1.05(e), which states - The Clerk is authorized and directed to require a complete and executed AO Form JS44, Civil Cover Sheet, which shall accompany each civil case as a condition to the filing thereof. State and federal prisoners, and other persons filing civil cases pro se are exempt from the requirements of this subsection. File a completed Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CTR)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:19-cv-2483-T-23CPT. (SJB)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 JOINDER in motion by FCA US LLC And Additional Basis for Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Master Transaction Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Order Authorizing Sale, #3 Exhibit C - Stipulation and Agreed Order, #4 Exhibit D - Amendment No. 4 to Master Transaction Agreement)(Blank, Robert)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thirteenth Circuit Hillsborough County, Florida, case number 2019-CA-007969 filed in State Court on 07/31/19. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16001513 filed by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 State Court COMPLAINT , #9 State Court Docket Sheet , #10 State Court Other Documents , #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richman, Scott) Modified on 10/8/2019 (CTR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corona et al v. The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Scott Alan Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William O'Connor
Represented By: Daniel Mark Coton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Blank
Represented By: Meredith K. Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Guevara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. R.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magdalena Corona
Represented By: Robert Frank Melton, II
Represented By: James H. Hada
Represented By: William Carl Ourand
Represented By: C. Richard Newsome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. T.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Y. T.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U. T.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?