Porter v. Secretary, Department of Corrections et al (Hillsborough County)
Petitioner: Aaron C. Porter
Respondent: Attorney General, State of Florida and Secretary, Department of Corrections
Case Number: 8:2019cv02505
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Tanoos on behalf of Secretary, Department of Corrections (Tanoos, Jonathan)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to respond and show cause why the petition should not be granted. Respondent has 90 days to respond. Petitioner has 30 days to reply to the petition response. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is GRANTED. Clerk is directed to serve the petition. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Service Documents 1, #2 Appendix A-B, #3 Appendix C-E, #4 Appendix F, #5 Appendix F-2, #6 Appendix G, #7 Appendix H, #8 Appendix I, #9 Appendix J-K, #10 Service Documents 2)(RAO) Modified on 11/25/2019 (RAO).
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of change of address by Aaron C. Porter. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LD)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1. (GSO)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Aaron C. Porter. (CTR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State filed by Aaron C. Porter. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C-E, #4 Appendix F, #5 Appendix F2, #6 Appendix G, #7 Appendix H, #8 Appendix I, #9 Appendix J-K, #10 Mailing Envelope)(Appendix in Expandable)(CTR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. Secretary, Department of Corrections et al (Hillsborough County)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General, State of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary, Department of Corrections
Represented By: Jonathan Tanoos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Aaron C. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?