Emrit v. Universal Music Group et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Defendant: Estate of Shakir Stewart, Island Def Jam Group, Universal Music Group and Rick Ross
Case Number: 8:2019cv02562
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Sean P Flynn
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 14 APPENDIX (1) CD re #11 MOTION for preliminary injunction by Ronald Satish Emrit Filed Separately. (BES)
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #11 MOTION for a preliminary injunction filed by Ronald Satish Emrit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 11/25/2019. (CKR)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER referring the motion for preliminary injunction (Doc. #11) to the Honorable Sean P. Flynn, United States Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B), for an evidentiary hearing and the issuance of a Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/22/2019. (DMD)
November 21, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for preliminary injunction by Ronald Satish Emrit. (BES)
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of temporary change of address by Ronald Satish Emrit (BES)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ronald Satish Emrit. Related case(s): yes (BES)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Estate of Shakir Stewart, Island Def Jam Group, Rick Ross, Universal Music Group. (BES)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 10/29/2019. (CKR)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff shall review and comply with the provisions of this Order, as well as the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Rules of the Middle District of Florida, and any applicable statutes and regulations. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/28/2019. (TWL)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/28/2019. (TWL)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER transferring case to Tampa Division. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/15/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 Copyright Report sent to Washington. (EJS)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronald Satish Emrit. (EJS) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Estate of Shakir Stewart, Island Def Jam Group, Rick Ross, Universal Music Group with Jury Demand filed by Ronald Satish Emrit. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(EJS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emrit v. Universal Music Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Shakir Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Island Def Jam Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?