Cuculici v. Lexington Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Dana Cuculici
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv02575
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive motions due by 10/16/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/14/2021 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung, Jury Trial set for the March 2021 trial term commencing 3/01/2021 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15B before Judge William F. Jung, Conduct mediation hearing by 6/15/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 12/4/2019. (SAO)
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Sechrist, Lindsay)
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Lexington Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty US, Inc. for Lexington Insurance Company. (Sechrist, Lindsay)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Lexington Insurance Company. Related case(s): Yes (Sechrist, Lindsay)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Dana Cuculici. Related case(s): no (Pekar, Jeffrey)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Dana Cuculici. (Pekar, Jeffrey)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Lexington Insurance Company.(Sechrist, Lindsay)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 10/22/2019. (SAO)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Lexington Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty US, Inc. for Lexington Insurance Company. (Sechrist, Lindsay)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Lexington Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sechrist, Lindsay)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:19-cv-2575-T-02CPT. (SJB)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thirteenth Judicial Circuit for Hillsborough County, Florida, case number 19-CA-10039 filed in State Court on 09/30/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16042435 filed by Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sechrist, Lindsay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cuculici v. Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Cuculici
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Pekar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Lindsay Lee Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?