Fitzgerald Motors, Inc. v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Fitzgerald Motors, Inc. d/b/a Fitzgerald's Countryside Chrysler Jeep and Fitzgerald Motors, Inc.
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv02661
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Forehand, John)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #18 the Unopposed Motion to Withdraw. The Clerk is directed to TERMINATE Attorney Charles A. Samarkos and the law firm of Johnson, Pope, Bokor, Ruppel & Burns, LLP as counsel of record and recipient of filings for Plaintiff, Fitzgerald Motors, Inc. d/b/a Fitzgerald Countryside Chrysler Jeep. Attorney John Forehand and Craig Spickard of the law firm Kurkin Forehand Brandes, LLP., will continue to represent Plaintiff in this matter. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/2/2019. (SBA)
November 25, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Charles A. Samarkos to withdraw as attorney by Fitzgerald Motors, Inc. (Samarkos, Charles) Modified text on 11/25/2019 (JNB).
November 22, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to #8 Counterclaim by Fitzgerald Motors, Inc. Related document: #8 Answer to Complaint/Counterclaim filed by FCA US LLC.(Forehand, John) Modified text on 11/22/2019 (JNB).
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #15 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorneys George W. Mykulak and Nolan J. Mitchell may appear pro hac vice, subject to the requirement that counsel comply with the email registration requirements of Local Rule 2.01(d), M.D. Fla., within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 11/19/2019. (BEE)
November 19, 2019 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Nolan J. Mitchell to appear pro hac vice by FCA US LLC. (Bertron, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
November 19, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for George W. Mykulak to appear pro hac vice by FCA US LLC. (Bertron, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE to counsel Nolan J. Mitchell and George W. Mykulak of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (NAS)
November 12, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Fitzgerald Motors, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent JJF Management Services, Inc. for Fitzgerald Motors, Inc. (Forehand, John) Modified text on 11/12/2019 (JNB).
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Fitzgerald Motors, Inc. Related case(s): No (Forehand, John) Modified text on 11/12/2019 (JNB).
November 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by FCA US LLC. Related case(s): yes (Bertron, James)
November 11, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by FCA US LLC. (Bertron, James)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Fitzgerald Motors, Inc. by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition Requesting Proceeding and Administrative Hearing, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Petition Requesting Proceeding and Administrative Hearing)(Bertron, James)
October 31, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney George W. Mykulak, appearing on behalf of FCA US LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA058743.). (TDC)
October 31, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Nolan J. Mitchell, appearing on behalf of FCA US LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA058743.). (TDC)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/12/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/28/2019. (APV)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/12/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/28/2019. (APV)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Lisa Humphreys by FCA US LLC. (WCD)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Jereen G. Trudell by FCA US LLC. (WCD)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance of Ginger Barry Boyd Appearance by Ginger Barry Boyd on behalf of FCA US LLC (Boyd, Ginger) Modified text on 10/28/2019 (JNB).
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:19-cv-2661-T-35AAS. (SJB)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL FCA US LLC'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL from SIXTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT, PINELLAS COUNTY, FL, case number 201-6403-CI filed in State Court on 09/24/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16072459 filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit C, #4 State Court Docket Sheet Exhibit D-1, #5 State Court Other Documents Exhibit D-2, #6 State Court Other Documents Exhibit D-3, #7 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit D-4, #8 State Court Other Documents Exhibit D-5)(Bertron, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitzgerald Motors, Inc. v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fitzgerald Motors, Inc. d/b/a Fitzgerald's Countryside Chrysler Jeep
Represented By: Charles A. Samarkos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fitzgerald Motors, Inc.
Represented By: Charles A. Samarkos
Represented By: John W. Forehand
Represented By: Robert Craig Spickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Ginger Barry Boyd
Represented By: James Andrew Bertron, Jr.
Represented By: Nolan J. Mitchell
Represented By: George W. Mykulak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?