Aflou v. Waypoint Resource Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Aziz Aflou
Defendant: Waypoint Resource Group, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv02690
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #9 Defendant's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including January 9, 2019 to file its answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/19/2019. (APF)
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Waypoint Resource Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Trellis Company, Other Affiliate Alan Ginsberg, Other Affiliate Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A., Other Affiliate David C. Borucke, Other Affiliate Trellis Holdings, Inc, Other Affiliate Aziz Aflou for Waypoint Resource Group, LLC. (Borucke, David) Modified text on 12/18/2019 (JNB).
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Waypoint Resource Group, LLC. (Borucke, David)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Borucke on behalf of Waypoint Resource Group, LLC (Borucke, David)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Aziz Aflou. Related case(s): yes (Ginsberg, Alan)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/17/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/3/2019. (APV)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/17/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/3/2019. (APV)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Aziz Aflou. (Ginsberg, Alan)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Waypoint Resource Group, LLC. (WCD)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-2690-T-35SPF. (SJB)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Waypoint Resource Group, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16082072) filed by Aziz Aflou. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Ginsberg, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aflou v. Waypoint Resource Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waypoint Resource Group, LLC
Represented By: David C. Borucke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aziz Aflou
Represented By: Alan Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?