Guevara v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Luz A. Guevara
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv02693
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 11/15/2019 by Luz A. Guevara as to Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Chambers, G.)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Monsanto Company. (WCD)
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice by Luz A. Guevara. (Chambers, G.)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Luz A. Guevara. Related case(s): yes (Chambers, G.)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 10/30/2019. (SAO)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:19-cv-2693-T-02TGW. (SJB)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16084446) filed by Luz A. Guevara. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Chambers, G.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guevara v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz A. Guevara
Represented By: G. Katherine Chambers
Represented By: T. Michael Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?