Deffenbaugh v. Smith & Nephew Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gary W. Deffenbaugh, Jr.
Defendant: Smith & Nephew Inc., Smith & Nephew PLC, Smith & Nephew, Inc. and Smith & Nephew, PLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv02697
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James S Moody
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Acknowledgment - Transferred case has been opened in the District of Maryland as case 1:19-cv-03266, filed on 11/13/2019. (AG)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: District of Maryland. Transferee court case number: CCB-19-3266 re MDL case number: 2775. (AG)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 Amended MOTION to stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL No. 2775 and Memorandum in Support by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kouffman, Dominic)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) #4 motion to stay. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 11/5/2019. (JG)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL No. 2775 and Memorandum in Support by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kouffman, Dominic)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 10/30/2019. (KAC)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:19-cv-2697-T-30AEP. (SJB)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twelfth Judicial Circuit, Sarasota County, case number 2019-CA-5332-NC filed in State Court on 10/03/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16085166 filed by Smith & Nephew Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court COMPLAINT, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents)(Kouffman, Dominic) Modified on 10/31/2019 (WCD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deffenbaugh v. Smith & Nephew Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew Inc.
Represented By: Dominic Kouffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Represented By: Dominic Kouffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary W. Deffenbaugh, Jr.
Represented By: James L. Essenson
Represented By: Barbara J. Welch
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?