Weinhold v. Carolina Preservation Partners et al
Appellee: Douglas A. Smith, Susan K. Woodard and Carolina Preservation Partners
Appellant: Wolf Arbin Weinhold
Case Number: 8:2019cv02710
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING as stated herein #3 Appellant's Emergency Motion for Stay of Bankruptcy Court's Orders Pending Appeal. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/20/2019. (APF)
December 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of docketing bankruptcy record on appeal advising counsel to comply with Rule 8018. Notice of appeal filed in U.S. District Court on 12/05/2019. (LD)
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: #1 Bankruptcy notice of appeal filed by Wolf Arbin Weinhold. (Attachments: #1 2. Notice of Appeal, #2 3. Order on Appeal, #3 4. Order on Appeal, #4 5. Order on Appeal, #5 6. Docket, #6 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000001_COMPLAINT_to_Recover_Money_or_Property_9_counts_SN__ORIGINAL_NIBS_DOCKET_ENTRY_1_Ad, #7 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000010_ANSWER_by_Defendant_and_Affirmative_DefensesCarolina_Preservation_Partners_Inc_and_Dougla, #8 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000012_MOTION_To_Dismiss_Debtor_with_incorporated_memorandum_AM__ORIGINAL_NIBS_DOCKET_ENTRY, #9 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000018_MEMORANDUM_in_Opposition_to_Debtors_Motion_to_Dismiss_by_Plaintiff_Susan_K_Woodard_Tee, #10 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000028_ORDER_on_Motion_to_Dismiss_granted_as_to_Count_I_and_Count_I_Revocation_of_Discharge_wit, #11 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000029_TRANSCRIPT_Motion_to_Dismiss_Re_Item__19__AM__ORIGINAL_NIBS_DOCKET_ENTRY_29_Additio, #12 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000033_ANSWER_by_Defendant_Wolf_A_Weinhold_and_Affirmative_DefensesCounts_II-IX_AM__ORIGINAL, #13 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000038_Carolina_Preservation_Partners_Inc_and_Douglas_A_Smith_Contested_Facts_AM__ORIGINAL, #14 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000039_Part_1_Pretrial_Compliance_by_Defendants_Carolina_Preservation_Parners_Inc_Entered_1206200, #15 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000039_Part_2_Wolf_A_Weinholds_Summary_Statement_of_the_Theory_of_His_Defenses, #16 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000048_EXHIBITS_Disclosures_by_Defendants_Carolina_Preservation_Partners_Inc_and_Douglas_A_S, #17 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000065_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_with_Respect_to_Counts_VII_and_IX_Filed_by_P_Benjamin_Zuckerma, #18 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000066_Memorandum_in_Support_of_His_Motion_for_Summary_Judgment_with_Respect_to_Counts_VIIand_IX, #19 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_1_Affidavit_of_Wolf_Arbin_Weinhold_Filed_by_Defendant_Wolf_Arbin_Weinhold, #20 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_2_1, #21 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_3_2, #22 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_4_3, #23 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_5_4, #24 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_6_5, #25 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_7_6, #26 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_8_7, #27 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_9_8, #28 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_10_9, #29 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_11_10, #30 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_12_11, #31 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_13_12, #32 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_14_13, #33 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_15_37, #34 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_16_45, #35 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_17_46, #36 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_18_47, #37 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_19_50, #38 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_20_51, #39 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_21_54, #40 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_22_56, #41 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_23_57, #42 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_24_58, #43 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_25_59, #44 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_26_60, #45 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_27_61, #46 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_28_62, #47 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_29_63, #48 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_30_64, #49 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_31_65, #50 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_32_66, #51 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_33_68, #52 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_34_69, #53 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_35_71, #54 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_36_74, #55 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_37_75, #56 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_38_76, #57 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_39_77, #58 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_40_79, #59 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_41_80, #60 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_42_81, #61 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_43_88, #62 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_44_89, #63 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_45_90, #64 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_46_91, #65 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_47_92, #66 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_48_93, #67 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_49_94, #68 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_50_95, #69 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000067_Part_51_97, #70 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000084_Memorandum_of_Law_in_Opposition_to_Wolf_Arbin_Weinholds_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_with, #71 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000085_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_Declaring_Her_to_Own_any_Right_Title_Interest_or_Claim_of_De, #72 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000096_Response_to_Memorandum_of_Law_in_Opposition_to_Wolf_Arbin_Weinholds_Motion_For_Summary_Ju, #73 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000097_Memorandum_of_Law_in_Opposition_to_Plaintiffs_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_Declaring_Her_t, #74 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000107_Transcript_Hearing_Excerpt_-Courts_Ruling, #75 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000110_Response_to_Memorandum_of_Law_in_Opposition_to_Plaintiffs_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_Dec, #76 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000114_Order_Denying_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_Declaring_Her_to_Own_Any_Right_Title_Interest_or, #77 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000115_Pre-Trial_Statement_unsigned_by_Defendants_attorney_Filed_by_Roberta_A_Colton_G_David_F, #78 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000119_Motion_to_Dismiss_Adversary_Proceeding_for_Lack_of_Standing_and_Supporting_Memorandum_of_L, #79 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000122_Part_1_Motion_in_Limine_as_to_Matters_Barred_by_the_Doctrines_of_Judicial_and_Collateral_Estoppel, #80 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000122_Part_2_Exhibit_A, #81 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000122_Part_3_Exhibit_F, #82 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000122_Part_4_Exhibit_G, #83 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000123_Pre-Trial_Statement_Final, #84 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000135_Objection_to_Motion_to_Dismiss_for_Lack_of_Standing, #85 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000143_Part_1_Transcript_of_111703, #86 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000143_Part_2_transcript, #87 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000144_Part_1_Transcript_Novmeber_18_2004_Final_Evidentiary_Hearing, #88 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000144_Part_2_coversheet, #89 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000145_Part_1_Transcript_of_Novmeber_18_2003_Hearing, #90 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000145_Part_2_Transcript, #91 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000146_Part_1_Transcript_November_19_2003_Final_Evidentiary_Hearing, #92 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000146_Part_2_transcript, #93 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000147_Part_1_Transcript_November_19_2003_Final_Evidentiary_Hearing, #94 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000147_Part_2_transcript, #95 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000148_Transcript_cover_sheet_only_for_November_19_2003_Final_Evidentiary_Hearing, #96 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000149_Part_1_Transcript_for_November_19_2003_Final_Evidentiary_Hearing, #97 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000149_Part_2_Transcript, #98 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000152_Order_Directing_Mediation_Appointing_Mediator_and_Establishing_Mediation_Compensation, #99 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000161_Consent_Order_Authorizing_Trustee_to_Easement_Agreement_with_the_North_Carolina_Dept_of_Tr, #100 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000163_Part_1_Motion, #101 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000163_Part_2_Exhibit_A, #102 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000163_Part_3_Exhibit_B, #103 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000163_Part_4_Exhibit_C, #104 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000169_Order_Granting_Motion_Trustees_Motion_for_Confirmation_of_Her_Authority_Pursuant_to_this, #105 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000196_Notice_of_Actions_taken_by_DebtorDefendant_Weinhold_to_Mitigate_Damages_Caused_by_the_Non, #106 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000197_Objection_to_Trustees_Motion_for_Authority_to, #107 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000208_Notice_of_Corrected_Time_for_Further_Status_Conference_Filed_by_Russell_M_Blain_on_behalf, #108 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000213_Transcript_from_Hearing_held_on_May_31_2006_on_Continued_Status_Conference, #109 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000222_Part_1_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_and_Supporting_Memorandum_of_Law_Filed_by_Robert_L_Rocke_on_be, #110 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000222_Part_2_Exhibit_A, #111 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000222_Part_3_Exhibit_B, #112 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000222_Part_4_Exhibit_C, #113 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000223_Motion_to_Strike_Defendants_Smith_and_CPPs_Untimely_and_Unauthorized_Motion_for_Summary_J, #114 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000226_Part_1_Motion_to_Join_in_and_Support_Defendants_Carolina_Preservation_Partners_Inc_and_Douglas_A, #115 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000226_Part_2_Attachment, #116 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000233_Motion_to_Strike_Defendant_Wolf_A_Weinholds_Untimely_and_Unauthorized_Motion_to_Join_In, #117 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000244_Memorandum_in_Opposition_to_Trustees_Motion_to_Strike_Defendants_Motion_for_Summary_Judg, #118 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000245_Memorandum_in_Opposition_to_Trustees_Motion_to_Strike_Defendants_Motion_to_Join_in_and_S, #119 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000252_Order_Granting_Motion_to_Strike_Defendants_Smith_and_CPPs_Untimely_and_Unauthorized_Motio, #120 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000253_Order_Granting_Motion_to_Strike_Defendant_Wolf_A_Weinholds_Untimely_and_Unauthorized_Mot, #121 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000260_Amended_Exhibit_List__Amended_Witness_List_Filed_by_Roberta_A_Colton_on_behalf_of_Plaint, #122 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000263_Exhibit_List_Filed_by_Robert_L_Rocke_on_behalf_of_Defendants_Carolina_Preservation_Partner, #123 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000264_Witness_List_Filed_by_Robert_L_Rocke_on_behalf_of_Defendants_Carolina_Preservation_Partner, #124 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000268_Witness_List_and_Exhibit_List_Filed_by_Defendant_Wolf_Arbin_Weinhold, #125 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000276_Transcript_from_Hearing_Held_on_February_2_2007_regarding_the_Emergency_Motion_to_Comprom, #126 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000287_Transcript_Regarding_Hearing_Held_11910_on_Status_Conference_To_purchase_a_copy_of_this, #127 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000296_Joint_Motion_Clarifying_Property_Ownership_Filed_by_Jonathan_B_Sbar_on_behalf_of_Defendant, #128 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000297_Joint_Stipulated_Motion_for_the_Court_to_Order_the_Repair_Maintenance_Installation_of_Im, #129 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000300_Joint_Scheduling_Order, #130 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000304_Supplemental_Witness_List__Supplemental_Exhibit_List_Filed_by_Defendant_Wolf_Arbin_Weinho, #131 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000305_Motion_for_Approval_to_Enter_Into_a_Compromise_and_Settlement_with_the_North_Carolina_Depa, #132 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000306_Part_1_Motion_to_Order_the_Documentation_and_Surveying_of_Historical_or_Common_Law_Right_of_Way_A, #133 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000306_Part_2_Exhibit_1, #134 8-01-ap-00872_Docket_000306_Part_
November 20, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in support re #10 Order on motion to stay, #9 Response in Opposition to Motion Regarding Standard of Review on Motion for Stay filed by Wolf Arbin Weinhold. (Jaffer, John)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #3 Emergency Motion of Debtor and Appellant, Wolf A. Weinhold, for Stay of Bankruptcy Court's Orders Pending Appeal and for Emergency Temporary Stay Pending Decision on Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/13/2019. (APF)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 Emergency MOTION to stay Bankruptcy Court's Orders Pending Appeal and for Emergency Temporary Stay Pending Decision on Motion for Stay Pending Appeal filed by Carolina Preservation Partners, Douglas A. Smith. (Rocke, Robert)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 Case Reassigned to Judge Mary S. Scriven. New case number: 8:19-cv-2710-T-35. Judge Thomas P. Barber no longer assigned to the case. (JNB)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER DIRECTING Appellees to file an expedited response to #3 the Emergency Motion of Debtor and Appellant, Wolf A. Weinhold, for Stay of Bankruptcy Court's Orders Pending Appeal and for Emergency Temporary Stay Pending Decision on Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. Appellees shall file a response to the Emergency Motion on or before 5:00 PM on Tuesday, November 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/8/2019. (APF)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Upon the consent of Judge Mary S. Scriven and pursuant to Local Rule 1.03(d), it is hereby ordered that this case is transferred to Judge Scriven. The Clerk is directed to reassign this case to Judge Scriven for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 11/8/2019. (ZRN)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to the Courts to take judicial notice regarding #3 Emergency MOTION to stay Bankruptcy Court's Orders Pending Appeal and for Emergency Temporary Stay Pending Decision on Motion for Stay Pending Appeal by Wolf Arbin Weinhold. (Jaffer, John)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 APPENDIX re #3 Emergency MOTION to stay Bankruptcy Court's Orders Pending Appeal and for Emergency Temporary Stay Pending Decision on Motion for Stay Pending Appeal by Wolf Arbin Weinhold. (Attachments: #1 Appendix IA to II, #2 Appendeix IJ Ex 1 to WA Ex 4, #3 Appendix IJ Ex 1 to Composite Ex 3, #4 Appendix IJ Ex 4-9 and Ex 3-5, #5 Appendix IJ Ex 6 to IX, #6 Appendix II A to II B)(Jaffer, John)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION to stay Bankruptcy Court's Orders Pending Appeal and for Emergency Temporary Stay Pending Decision on Motion for Stay Pending Appeal by Wolf Arbin Weinhold. (Jaffer, John)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1 issued by Deputy Clerk on 11/4/2019. (SRC)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by Wolf Arbin Weinhold. Bankruptcy Court case number 8:94-bk-6261-MGW. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 10/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to District Court)(LD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weinhold v. Carolina Preservation Partners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Douglas A. Smith
Represented By: William Keith Fendrick
Represented By: Robert L. Rocke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Susan K. Woodard
Represented By: Susan Keglovich Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Carolina Preservation Partners
Represented By: Robert L. Rocke
Represented By: William Keith Fendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Wolf Arbin Weinhold
Represented By: John Samuel Jaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?