Ford v. Waage et al
Appellee: Florida Department of Revenue and Jon M. Waage
Appellant: Roderick Ford
Case Number: 8:2019cv02724
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE re #7 Notice of pendency of related cases filed by Roderick Ford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Appellate Brief (Filed October 28, 2018))(Ford, Roderick)
December 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases 8:19-ap-00234-RCT per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Roderick Ford. Related case(s): yes (Ford, Roderick)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 APPELLEE'S BRIEF by Jon M. Waage. (McIntyre, Kimberly)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jon M. Waage. Related case(s): yes (McIntyre, Kimberly)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 APPELLEE'S BRIEF by Florida Department of Revenue. (Attachments: #1 Notice of other cases)(Rudzik, Frederick)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/30/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/10/2019. (APV)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 APPELLANT'S BRIEF by Roderick Ford. (Ford, Roderick)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of docketing bankruptcy record on appeal advising counsel to comply with Rule 8018. Notice of appeal filed in U.S. District Court on 11/12/2019. (LD)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: #1 Bankruptcy notice of appeal filed by Roderick Ford. (Attachments: #1 2 Notice of Appeal, #2 3 Amended Notice of Appeal, #3 4 Order being Appealed - #242, #4 4a Order being Appealed - #252, #5 4b Order being Appealed - #253, #6 4c Possible Order being Appealed per Appellant Designation #175, #7 4d Possible Order Being Appealed#144, #8 5 Appellant Designation and Statement of Issues, #9 6 Appellee Designation, #10 7 Public Docket, #11 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000001_Voluntary_Petition_under_Chapter_13, #12 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000002_Chapter_13_Plan_Filed_by_Roderick_O_Ford_of_Roderick_O_Ford_PLLC_on_behalf_of_Roderick_For, #13 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000005_Second_Amended_Administrative_Order_FLMB-2016-2_Prescribing_Procedures_for_Chapter_13_Case, #14 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000006_Notice_of_Commencement_of_Case_Section_341_Meeting_of_Creditors_and_Fixing_Deadlines__S, #15 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000010_Part_1_Notice_of_Compliance_with_Outstanding_Support_Payments_and, #16 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000010_Part_2_Exhibit_A, #17 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000012_Part_1_Objection_to_Claim, #18 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000012_Part_2_Exhibit_Fla_Dept_of_Revenue-_State_Disbursement_Unit, #19 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000015_Motion_to_Re-Set_341_Meeting_of_Creditors_Filed_by_Roderick_O_Ford_on_behalf_of_Debtor_Rod, #20 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000016_Part_1_Motion_For_Relief_from_Creditor_Collection_Actions_pursuant_to_11_USC_Sect_523, #21 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000016_Part_2_Exhibit_A_Final_Judgement, #22 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000019_Motion_to_Dismiss_Case_for_Failure_to_Comply_with_First_Day_Order_of_One_or_More_Deficien, #23 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000020_Part_1_Objection_to_Chapter_13_Trustees_Motion_To_Dismiss_Pursuant_to_Rule_11_of_the_FedRCivP, #24 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000020_Part_2_Exhibit_A_Handbook_for_US_Trustees_USDOJ, #25 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000020_Part_3_Exhibit_B_Rule_11_Letter_to_Chapter_13_Trustee, #26 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000022_Order_Reserving_Ruling_on_Trustees_Motion_to_Dismiss_Case_and_Rescheduling_Section_341_Me, #27 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000023_Motion_to_Vacate_Order_Reserving_Ruling_on_Chapter_13_Trustees_Motion_To_Dismiss_and_Moti, #28 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000026_Corrective_Motion_to_Dismiss_Case_Failure_to_Comply_and_Rescheduling_341_Meeting_of_Credi, #29 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000027_Part_1_Response_to_Corrective_Motion_to_Dismiss_Filed_by_Roderick_O_Ford_on_behalf_of_Debtor_Rode, #30 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000027_Part_2_Exhibit_A_Agreed_Order-_and_Stipulation_of_the_Parties, #31 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000030_Part_1_Withdrawal_of_Motion_To_Vacate, #32 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000030_Part_2_Exhibit_Agreed_Order, #33 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000031_Agreed_Order_Granting_in_Part_Motion_to_Reschedule_341_Meeting_of_Creditors_and, #34 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000032_Withdrawal_of_Trustees_Motions_to_Dismiss_Case_Filed_by_Kimberly_McIntyre_on_behalf_of_Tr, #35 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000034_Response_to_Objection_to_Claim_No2_Filed_by_Gordon_L_Kiester_on_behalf_of_Creditor_Dept_O, #36 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000038_Notice_of_Intent_to_File_Corrective_or_Amended_Schedules_Post-341_Meeting_of_Creditors_Fil, #37 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000039_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Sarah_Olsen_RULING_Initial_Confirmat, #38 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000042_Chapter_13_Trustees_Unfavorable_Recommendation_and_Objection_Concerning_Confirmation_of_t, #39 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000044_Part_1_Notice_of_Filing_Debtors_Proffer_of_Evidence_to_Support_Satisfaction_of_Alimony_Payments, #40 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000044_Part_2_Index_Table_of_Cases, #41 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000044_Part_3_Exhibit_A_through_C, #42 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000044_Part_4_Exhibit_D_through_I, #43 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000047_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_RODERICK_FORD_GORDON_KIESTER_RULIN, #44 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000050_Part_1_Motion_To_Correct_Scrivenors_Error, #45 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000050_Part_2_Exhibit_A_Final_Divorce_Decree, #46 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000054_Order_Granting_Motion_to_Correct_Scriveners_Error, #47 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000055_Part_1_Objection_to_Claim, #48 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000055_Part_2_Exhibit_A_Proof_of_Claim, #49 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000058_Part_1_Motion_to_Direct_Florida_Department_of_Revenue_to_Reinstate_Debtors_Revoked_Florida_Drive, #50 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000058_Part_2_Exhibit_1_Letter_to_Gordon_Kiester_Exhibit_2_Court_Order_Exhibit_3_Smith_v_Sm, #51 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000062_Response_to_Debtors_Objection_to_Proof_of_Claim_4_Filed_by_Jay_D_Passer_on_behalf_of_Cr, #52 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000063_Part_1_Notice_of_Filing_STATUS_REPORT_RE_DEBTORS_ACCOUNTING_FOR_DOMESTIC_SUPPORT_OBLIGATION_PAY, #53 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000063_Part_2_Exhibit_A_Letter_to_Gordon_Keister_Esq_Florida_Department_of_Revenue_dated_3, #54 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000065_Order_on_Objection_to_Claim_2_of_Florida_Department_of_Revenue_Ruling_Deferred, #55 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000067_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Sarah_Olsen_RULING_CONTINUED_Confirm, #56 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000078_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_RODERICK_FORD_GORDON_KIESTER_Sarah, #57 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000079_Part_1_Motion_for_Reconsideration_of_Confirmation_Hearing_Order, #58 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000079_Part_2_Exhibit_1_Court_Doc__73, #59 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000079_Part_3_Exhibit_2_Court_Doc__76, #60 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000079_Part_4_Exhibit_3_Court_Doc__77, #61 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000081_Part_1_Motion_for_Reconsideration_of_Confirmation_Hearing_Order_of_August_9_2017_Motion_for_Tri, #62 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000081_Part_2_Exhibit_1_Court_Doc__73, #63 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000081_Part_3_Exhibit_2_Court_Doc__76, #64 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000081_Part_4_Exhibit_3_Court_Doc__77, #65 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000082_Memorandum, #66 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000084_Corrective_Notice_of_Withdrawal_of_Doc_79, #67 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000085_Part_1_Motion_to_Vacate_Modify_and_Reinstate_Orders_on_Debtors_Objection_to_Florida_Department, #68 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000085_Part_2_Exhibit_A_Order_on_Debtors_Motion_To_Correct_Scriveners_Error, #69 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000086_Part_1_Certificate_Regarding_Domestic_Support_Obligation_Filed_by_Roderick_O_Ford_on_behalf_of_De, #70 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000086_Part_2_Attachment__3, #71 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000087_Transcript_Regarding_Hearing_Held_8-9-17_on_Continued_Confirmation_Hearing_To_purchase_a, #72 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000088_Part_1_Notice_of_Filing_Cease-and-Desist_Pre-Suit_Notice_Letter, #73 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000088_Part_2_Pre-Suit_Notice, #74 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000088_Part_3_Attachment_2_Final_Divorce_Decree_08-07-15, #75 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000088_Part_4_Attachment_3_Final_Judgment_Order_03-02-12, #76 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000088_Part_5_Attachment_1_Obligors_Duties_09-26-16, #77 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000092_Part_1_Notice_of_Filing, #78 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000092_Part_2_Appendix_A_thru_D, #79 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000093_Notice_To_Court_Regarding_Lack_of_E-Service_to_Debtors_Counsel_Roderick_O_Ford_Esq_Fil, #80 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000094_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_RODERICK_FORD_FRED_RUDZICK_KIMBERLY, #81 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000095_Part_1_Motion_for_Reconsideration_of_Court_Rulings_Orders_of_October_4_2017_Filed_by_Roderick_O, #82 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000095_Part_2_Exhibit_A_Table_of_Authorities, #83 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000095_Part_3_Exhibit_B_Smith_v_Smith, #84 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000095_Part_4_Exhibit_C_Letter_to_Chief_Judge_Michael_Williamson, #85 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000096_Report_under_28_USC_Sec_586, #86 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000097_Response_to_Motion_for_Reconsideration_Filed_by_Frederick_F_Rudzik_on_behalf_of_Creditor_D, #87 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000098_Response_to_US_Trustees_Report_Pursuant_to_Rule_11_of_FedRCivP_and_28_USC_Sec_5, #88 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000099_Part_1_Response_to_Florida_Department_of_Revenues_Response_to_Debtors_Motion_For_Reconsideratio, #89 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000099_Part_2_Exhibit_A_In_Re_Laura_Lynn_Pescod, #90 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000099_Part_3_Exhibit_B_In_Re_Bruce_Gregory_Parker, #91 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000099_Part_4_Exhibit_C_Order_of_May_30_2017_Granting_Set-off_Recoupment, #92 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000100_Motion_to_Recuse_Judge_Catherine_Peek_McEwen_pursuant_to_28_USC_Sec_445, #93 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000101_Order_Denying_Debtors_Motion_for_Reconsideration_Motion_to_Trial_of_Debtors_Objection_t, #94 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000102_Affidavit_in_Support_of_Motion_to_Recuse, #95 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000103_Part_1_Motion_for_Reconsideration_of_Debtors_Motion_To_Vacate_Orders_and_for_Disallowance_of_Cla, #96 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000103_Part_2_Exhibit_A_Motion_To_Vacate, #97 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000104_Withdrawal_of_Debtors_Affidavit_in_Support_of_Motion_To_Recuse, #98 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000105_Affidavit_in_Support_of_Debtors_Motion_To_Recuse_US_Bankruptcy_Judge, #99 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000106_Withdrawal_of_Affidavit_in_Support_of_Debtors_Motion_To_Recuse_US_Bankruptcy_Court_Judg, #100 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000107_First_Amended_Affidavit_in_Support_of_Debtors_Motion_To_Recuse_US_Bankruptcy_Judge_28, #101 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000108_Part_1_Notice_of_Filing_Copy_of_Letter_To_Chapter_13_Trustees_Kelly_Remick_and_Jon_Waage_dated_Oc, #102 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000108_Part_2_Exhibit_A_Letter_to_Chapter_13_Trustees_Kelly_Remick_and_Jon_Waage, #103 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000109_Notice_of_Withdrawal_of_Debtors_Affidavit_in_Support_of_Motion_For_Recusal_of_US_Bankru, #104 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000111_Part_1_Second_Amended_Affidavit_in_Support_of_Debtors_Motion_To_Recuse_US_Bankruptcy_Court_Jud, #105 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000111_Part_2_Certificate_of_Service_of_Second_Amended_Affidavit, #106 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000111_Part_3_Letter_to_Chief_Judge_Michael_Williamson, #107 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000112_Notice_of_Appeal_of_Order_Denying_Debtors_Motion_for_Reconsideration_filed_10182017, #108 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000116_Part_1_Notice_of_Filing_US_Trustees_Letter_Concerning_the_Debtors_Notice_of_Appeal, #109 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000116_Part_2_Exhibit_A_Letter_From_US_Trustee_Concerning_the_Notice_of_Appeal, #110 8-16-bk-07504_Docket_000116_Part_3_Exhibit_
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by Roderick Ford. Bankruptcy Court case number 8:16-bk-07504-RCT. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 10/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Amended Notice of Appeal, #2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(AG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. Waage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Florida Department of Revenue
Represented By: Gordon Livingston Kiester, Jr.
Represented By: Frederick Francis Rudzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jon M. Waage
Represented By: Kimberly McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Roderick Ford
Represented By: Roderick O. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?