Haegele et al v. Judd et al
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA HAEGELE, as personal representative of the estate of CHANCE HAEGELE, deceased, for the benefit of his estate and survivors, to wit: CHRISTINA HAEGELE and CHRISTINA HAEGELE, ind and Christina Haegele
Defendant: JOSEPH HICKS, GRADY JUDD, SHERIFF POLK COUNTY, REGINALD GREEN and Grady Judd
Not Yet Classified: Peter J. Grilli
Case Number: 8:2019cv02750
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Christina Haegele. (Mattox, Marie)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER regarding motions for summary judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/27/2019. (TWL)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER: In light of the Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order (Doc. #17), no case management hearing will be held. Additionally, in order to keep cases moving on track, the Court has found it necessary to impose some restrictions on the types and number of extensions to case management deadlines that it grants. Thus, the parties are advised that, while short extensions, especially if unopposed, will be favorably considered, the Court will not substantially move the dispositive motions deadline or the trial date. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/27/2019. (TWL)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/12/2020 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Jury Trial set for the December 2020 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Conduct mediation hearing by 7/17/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/27/2019. (TWL)
December 23, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Christina Haegele, Christina Haegele. Related case(s): N (Mattox, Marie)
December 23, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Christina Haegele, Christina Haegele. (Mattox, Marie)
December 23, 2019 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Mattox, Marie)
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss complaint by Reginald Green, Joseph Hicks. (Campbell, Hank)
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss complaint by Grady Judd. (Campbell, Hank)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Reginald Green, Joseph Hicks, Grady Judd. (Campbell, Hank)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by December 23, 2019, file a completed Case Management Report. This document can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that the Court's Case Management Report form is different from those used by other judges. Local Rule 3.05(c)(2)(E), M.D. Fla., explains that most track two cases, like the present case, "will be tried within one year after the filing of the complaint." To accomplish this goal, the Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery. If the parties believe that more time than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. The Court will then determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/25/2019. (DMD)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting the unopposed motion to extend time to respond to the Complaint. (Doc. #8). Defendants' responses to the Complaint now due December 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/25/2019. (DMD)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Grady Judd. (Trohn, Jonathan)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Christina Haegele, Christina Haegele. Related case(s): No (Mattox, Marie)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/12/2019. (TWL)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/12/2019. (TWL)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Reginald Green, Joseph Hicks, Grady Judd, Division of Risk Management. (Attachments: #1 Main Document, #2 Main Document, #3 Main Document)(WCD)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:19-cv-2750-T-33CPT. (LRB)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Christina Haegele as personal representative of the estate of Chance Haegele, deceased, for the benefit of his estate and survivors, to wit: Christina Haegele and Christina Haegele, ind of Filing Civil Cover Sheet (Mattox, Marie) Modified on 11/6/2019 (WCD).
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Reginald Green, Joseph Hicks, Grady Judd, with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16113321) filed by Christina Haegele, as personal representative of the estate of Chance Haegele, deceased, for the benefit of his estate and survivors, to wit: ChristinaHaegele and Christina Haegele, ind. (Attachments: #1 Summons to be issued by clerk, #2 Summons to be issued by Clerk, #3 summons to be issued by Clerk, #4 Summons to be issued by Clerk)(Mattox, Marie) Modified on 11/6/2019 (WCD). Modified on 11/6/2019 (WCD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haegele et al v. Judd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH HICKS
Represented By: Hank B. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRADY JUDD, SHERIFF POLK COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REGINALD GREEN
Represented By: Hank B. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grady Judd
Represented By: Hank B. Campbell
Represented By: Jonathan Barnet Trohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA HAEGELE, as personal representative of the estate of CHANCE HAEGELE, deceased, for the benefit of his estate and survivors, to wit: CHRISTINA HAEGELE and CHRISTINA HAEGELE, ind
Represented By: Marie A. Mattox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Haegele
Represented By: Marie A. Mattox
Represented By: Katherine Lanier Viker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Peter J. Grilli
Represented By: Peter John Grilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?