Butler v. Gualtieri et al
Plaintiff: Marie Butler
Defendant: Bob Gualtieri, Amy Gee and State of Florida Department of Financial Services
Case Number: 8:2019cv02771
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James S Moody
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Farmer, Matthew)
December 31, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Counts I, II and V of the Amended Complaint (Doc. 13), MOTION to Dismiss Counts I, II and V of the Amended Complaint (Doc. 13) by Bob Gualtieri. (McDonough, Anne)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #11 Defendant Bob Gualtieri's motion to dismiss based on the filing of the Amended Complaint (Doc. 13). Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 12/30/2019. (JH)
December 23, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Amy Gee, Bob Gualtieri with Jury Demand. filed by Marie Butler. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Marie Butler.(Farmer, Matthew)
December 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bob Gualtieri. Related case(s): Yes (McDonough, Anne)
December 9, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Bob Gualtieri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McDonough, Anne)
November 29, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on November 21, 2019 by Marie Butler as to State of Florida Department of Financial Services. (Farmer, Matthew)
November 29, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on November 20, 2019 by Marie Butler as to Bob Gualtieri. (Farmer, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Marie Butler. Related case(s): no (Farmer, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 11/19/2019. (SMB)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to State of Florida and Bob Gualtieri. (JNB) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2019: #1 Main Document) (WCD). Modified on 11/13/2019 (WCD).
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Marie Butler. (Farmer, Matthew)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Marie Butler. (Farmer, Matthew)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Amy Gee. (WCD)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:19-cv-2771-T-30TGW. (LRB)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16123621) filed by Marie Butler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Bob Gualtieri, #3 Proposed Summons Amy Gee, #4 Proposed Summons Dept. of Financial Services)(Farmer, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Gualtieri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Gualtieri
Represented By: Anne F. McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Gee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Florida Department of Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Butler
Represented By: Matthew P. Farmer
Represented By: Todd Alan Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?