Davis v. Trident Asset Management, LLC
Plaintiff: Briana Davis
Defendant: Trident Asset Management, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv02796
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Briana Davis (Geiger, Bryan)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER: On the basis of Plaintiff's "Notice of Settlement" (Doc. #6), this cause is hereby dismissed, without prejudice and subject to the right of the parties, within 60 days of the date hereof, to submit a stipulated form of final order or judgment, or request an extension of time, should they so choose, or for any party to move to reopen the action, upon good cause being shown. After that 60 day period, however, without further order, this dismissal shall be deemed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate any previously scheduled deadlines and thereafter close this case. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 11/18/2019. (ANL)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of settlement by Briana Davis (Geiger, Bryan)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 11/14/2019. (SRC)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Trident Asset Management, LLC. Related case(s): No (WCD)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Trident Asset Management, LLC. (WCD)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:19-cv-2796-T-60CPT. (SJB)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hillsborough County, case number 292019SC053428A001HC filed in State Court on October 9, 2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16129451 filed by Trident Asset Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit 1, #2 State Court Other Documents Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement, #5 Notice of Pendency of Other Actiions, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Canter, Ronald) Modified on 11/13/2019 (WCD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Trident Asset Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trident Asset Management, LLC
Represented By: Ronald S. Canter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Briana Davis
Represented By: Bryan James Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?