Atashkhaneh v. Sam's East, Inc.
Plaintiff: GHASEM ATASHKHANEH
Defendant: SAM'S EAST, INC.
Case Number: 8:2019cv02814
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive motions due by 8/11/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 01/14/2021 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15B before Judge William F. Jung, Jury Trial set for the February 2021 trial term commencing 02/01/2021 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15B before Judge William F. Jung., Conduct mediation hearing by 8/3/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 12/24/2019. (SAO)
December 24, 2019 Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Beyer, Nancy)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 4 Related case order and track 2 notice by Ghasem Atashkhaneh. (LNR)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by Sam's East, Inc. (Beyer, Nancy)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice. Plaintiff's Notice of Pendency of Other Actions per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ghasem Atashkhaneh. Related case(s): yes (Attachments: #1 Main Document Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Printy, Gary)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Sam's East, Inc. Related case(s): no (Beyer, Nancy)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 11/14/2019. (SAO)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Entered in Error
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:19-cv-2814-T-02AEP. (SJB)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pasco County, case number 2019-CA-853 filed in State Court on March 12, 2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16141610 filed by SAM'S EAST, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 State Court COMPLAINT, #5 State Court ANSWER, #6 State Court Docket Sheet, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beyer, Nancy) Modified on 11/14/2019 (WCD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atashkhaneh v. Sam's East, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GHASEM ATASHKHANEH
Represented By: Gary L. Printy, Jr.
Represented By: Jason William Imler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAM'S EAST, INC.
Represented By: Nancy A. Beyer
Represented By: Kimberly J. Doud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?