Sherlock v. Lifestyle Hearing Corporation (USA), Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Michael Sherlock
Defendant: Widex USA, Inc., Audiology Management Group, Inc. and Lifestyle Hearing Corporation (USA), Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv02823
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE to counsel Lane Schiff, Katheryn Eisenmann, Janice G. Dubler of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (AG)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 TRANSFER IN from the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Case assigned to District Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New Case Number: 8:19-cv-2823-T-02CPT. (AG)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-00743. File received electronically
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED THAT PART OF THE MOTION SEEKING TO TRANSFER PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS GRANTED AND THIS CASE IS TRANSFERRED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF FLORIDA AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 10/10/19. 10/11/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) [Transferred from paed on 11/14/2019.]
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 10/10/19. 10/11/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) [Transferred from paed on 11/14/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 Reply in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by AUDIOLOGY MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC., LIFESTYLE HEARING CORPORATION (USA), INC., WIDEX USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Geigel, #2 Affidavit of Eric Spar, #3 Affidavit of Michael Tease)(EISENMANN, KATHERYN) Modified on 4/5/2019 (tjd). [Transferred from paed on 11/14/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by MICHAEL SHERLOCK. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Michael Sherlock, #3 Exhibit A-C)(SCHIFF, LANE) [Transferred from paed on 11/14/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by AUDIOLOGY MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC., LIFESTYLE HEARING CORPORATION (USA), INC., WIDEX USA, INC. Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A through E, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(DUBLER, JANICE) Modified on 3/4/2019 (tjd). [Transferred from paed on 11/14/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JANICE G. DUBLER on behalf of AUDIOLOGY MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC., LIFESTYLE HEARING CORPORATION (USA), INC., WIDEX USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(DUBLER, JANICE) [Transferred from paed on 11/14/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AUDIOLOGY MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC., LIFESTYLE HEARING CORPORATION (USA), INC., WIDEX USA, INC. from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, case number 190101605. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE192775) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(dmc, ) [Transferred from paed on 11/14/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sherlock v. Lifestyle Hearing Corporation (USA), Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Widex USA, Inc.
Represented By: Katheryn Eisenmann
Represented By: Janice G. Dubler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audiology Management Group, Inc.
Represented By: Katheryn Eisenmann
Represented By: Janice G. Dubler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifestyle Hearing Corporation (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Katheryn Eisenmann
Represented By: Janice G. Dubler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sherlock
Represented By: Lane Schiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?