Gonzales v. Giddens et al
Plaintiff: Eric Gonzales
Defendant: Alex Aviles, Rubin Garcia, Edward D. Mingus and Larry Giddens
Case Number: 8:2019cv02831
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of change of address by Eric Gonzales (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(CTR)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 1/2/2020. (NCR) (NCR).
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Eric Gonzales. Related case(s): yes (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(CTR)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/2/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 11/18/2019. (BGS)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eric Gonzales. (CTR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex Aviles, Rubin Garcia, Larry Giddens, Edward D. Mingus filed by Eric Gonzales. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(CTR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales v. Giddens et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Aviles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rubin Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward D. Mingus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Giddens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?