Graham, Jr. v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Marvin Graham, Jr and Marvin Graham, Jr.
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 8:2019cv02836
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF of service by Marvin Graham Jr. as to Attorney General of the United States. (TDC)
January 14, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF of service by Marvin Graham Jr. as to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel. (TDC)
January 14, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Marvin Graham Jr. Commissioner of Social Security (US Attorney) served on 12/31/2019, answer due 3/2/2020. (TDC)
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Marvin Graham, Jr. Related case(s): no (Steinberg, Michael)
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (LNR)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 11/25/2019. (SAO)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/10. (WCD)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Affidavit of Indigency/Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on 11/19/2019. (JAR)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:19-cv-2836-T-02JSS. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. (SJB)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Marvin Graham, Jr. (Steinberg, Michael)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Marvin Graham, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Steinberg, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham, Jr. v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Graham, Jr
Represented By: Michael Alan Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Graham, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Alan Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?