Palmer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Richard Palmer
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 8:2019cv02837
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James S Moody
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF of service by Richard Palmer as to Regional Counsel. (MCB)
January 14, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF of service by Richard Palmer as to Attorney General. (MCB)
January 14, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed by Richard Palmer. Commissioner of Social Security - US Attorney served on 12/24/2019, answer due 2/24/2020. (MCB)
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (BSN)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 construed amended motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 12/9/2019. (AMM)
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 Amended MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Richard Palmer. (Steinberg, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Richard Palmer. Related case(s): no (Steinberg, Michael)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 construed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 11/20/2019. (AMM)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 11/19/2019. (SMB)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/10. (WCD)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:19-cv-2837-T-30CPT. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. (SJB)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Richard Palmer. (Steinberg, Michael)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Richard Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Steinberg, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Palmer
Represented By: Michael Alan Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?