Roundtree v. Tegna, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Reginald Roundtree
Defendant: Pacific and Southern, LLC and Tegna, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv02857
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Telephonically. The parties may conduct their case management conference telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 1/10/2020. (NCR)
January 10, 2020 Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Appear Telephonically for Parties to Meet via Telephone Conference to Prepare Case Management Report by Tegna, Inc.. (Ball, Stephen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
January 9, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion for Judicial Notice by Reginald Roundtree re #20 Response in Opposition to Motion of Request for Judicial Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer)(Roebig, Thomas) Modified on 1/15/2020 (DG).
January 9, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss amended complaint filed by Reginald Roundtree. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Roebig, Thomas)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 12/18/2019. (NCR)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #15 Defendant's Tegna, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss amended complaint. Response is due by 1/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 12/18/2019. (NCR)
December 18, 2019 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss amended complaint by Reginald Roundtree. (Roebig, Thomas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
December 18, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss amended complaint by Reginald Roundtree. (Roebig, Taylor) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. ITEM TO BE REFILED BY COUNSEL WHO ELECTRONICALLY SIGNED SAME. Modified on 12/18/2019 (DG).
December 16, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss amended complaint by Tegna, Inc. (Gonzalez, Luis) Modified on 12/17/2019 (DG).
December 16, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #13 Amended Complaint by Pacific and Southern, LLC.(Ball, Stephen)
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Reginald Roundtree.(Roebig, Thomas)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Agreed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. As leave to amend should be freely given when justice so requires, Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint on or before December 2, 2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 11/25/2019. (BGS)
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Reginald Roundtree. (Roebig, Taylor)
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Reginald Roundtree. Related case(s): no (Roebig, Taylor)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Reginald Roundtree. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(Roebig, Taylor)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Pacific and Southern, LLC, Tegna, Inc.. (Ball, Stephen)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Pacific and Southern, LLC, Tegna, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Ball, Stephen)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Defendants' Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Responses due by 11/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 11/21/2019. (NCR)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal by All Defendants. (Ball, Stephen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/3/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 11/19/2019. (BGS)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/3/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 11/19/2019. (BGS)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-2857-T-36SPF. (SJB)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pinellas County Circuit Court, case number 19-006937 filed in State Court on October 18, 2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16161530 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ball, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roundtree v. Tegna, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific and Southern, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Thomas Ball
Represented By: Daniel J Kavanaugh
Represented By: Luis Javier Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tegna, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Thomas Ball
Represented By: Daniel J Kavanaugh
Represented By: Luis Javier Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Roundtree
Represented By: Wilfried Hermann Florin
Represented By: Parker Young Florin
Represented By: Thomas D. Roebig, Jr.
Represented By: Taylor D. Roebig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?