Rondevoo Technologies, LLC v. Inspirata, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rondevoo Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Inspirata, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv02863
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: William F Jung
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 11/25/2019. (SAO)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JNB)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint Exhibit F-'879 Exemplary Claim Chart by Rondevoo Technologies, LLC. (Wernow, Howard)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint Exhibit E-'266 Exemplary Claim Chart by Rondevoo Technologies, LLC. (Wernow, Howard)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint Exhibit D-'854 Exemplary Claim Chart by Rondevoo Technologies, LLC. (Wernow, Howard)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Inspirata, Inc. (WCD)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-2863-T-02SPF. (SJB)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Rondevoo Technologies, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Red Dragon Innovations, LLC for Rondevoo Technologies, LLC. (Wernow, Howard) Modified on 11/21/2019 (WCD).
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rondevoo Technologies, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing Fee $400, Receipt # 113A-16166221) filed by Rondevoo Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US Patent No. 7,088,854 B2, #2 Exhibit B-US Patent No. 7,254,266 B2, #3 Exhibit C-US Patent No. 8,687,879 B2, #4 Exhibit D-'854 Exemplary Claim Chart, #5 Exhibit E-'266 Exemplary Claim Chart, #6 Exhibit F-'879 Exemplary Claim Chart, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summons)(Wernow, Howard) Modified on 11/20/2019 to correct docket text (SJB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rondevoo Technologies, LLC v. Inspirata, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondevoo Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inspirata, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?