Carapella V. Glass
Interested Party: Jet Recycling America, Inc.
Appellant: Dawn A. Carapella
Appellee: Andrew B. Glass
Case Number: 8:2019cv03050
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Filing 10 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Objections to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions held on 4/16/19 before Judge Catherine Peek McEwen.(JNB)
January 30, 2020 Filing 9 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: #1 Bankruptcy notice of appeal filed by Dawn A. Carapella. (Attachments: #1 2 Pro Memo from 4-16-19 hearing Doc 169)(JN)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion to extend time to file appellant's brief up to and including 4/10/2020. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 1/15/2020. (CCB)
January 15, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to extend time to File Appellant's Brief by Dawn A. Carapella. (Sherman, Lynn)
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of docketing bankruptcy record on appeal advising counsel to comply with Rule 8018. Notice of appeal filed in U.S. District Court on 12/12/2019. (LNR)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: #1 Bankruptcy notice of appeal filed by Dawn A. Carapella. (Attachments: #1 2- Notice of Appeal 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000207_Part_1_Notice_of_Appeal_Filing_Fee_Not_Paid_or_Not_Required_Filed_by_Lynn_Welter_Sherman_Attor, #2 3 - Order on Appeal 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000198_Order_Granting_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_filed_by_the_Debtor_the_Court_will_enter_a_sep, #3 3a - Order on Appeal 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000201_Order_Overruling_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_Exemptions, #4 3b - Order on Appeal 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000203_Final_Judgment_in_Favor_of_the_Debtor_upholding_under_11_USC_ _522, #5 3c - Order on Appeal 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000206_Order_Denying_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_fioled_by_Trustee_Dawn_Carapella, #6 4 - Appeallants Designation 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000215_Appellant_Designation_of_Contents_for_Inclusion_in_Record_on_Appeal_Filed_by_Lynn_Welter_S, #7 5 - Glass Public Docket, #8 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000001_Voluntary_Petition_under_Chapter_7, #9 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000032_Amended_Schedule_ABSchedule_C_and_Summary_of_Assets_and_Liabilities_with_Certificate_of, #10 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000039_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_Exemptions__Contains_negative_notice_Filed_by_Megan_Wilso, #11 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000047_Response_to_the_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_Exemptions_filed_by_the_Trustee_Filed_by_Jo, #12 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000048_Notice_of_Hearing_on_Chapter_7_Trustees_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_Exemptions_Filed_b, #13 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000056_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_JONATHAN_SEMACH_MARK_HILDRETH_LORI, #14 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000066_Joinder_in_Trustees_Objection_to_Claim_of_Exemptions_Filed_by_Mark_D_Hildreth_on_behalf, #15 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000067_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_JONATHAN_SEMACH_LORI_VAUGHAN_MARK_H, #16 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000069_Emergency_Motion_For_Contempt__in_addition_to_Motion_For_Sanctions_for_Violation_of_the_A, #17 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000070_Emergency_Motion_for_Turnover_of_Property_-_specifically_Funds_in_IRA_Account_Filed_by_L, #18 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000071_Certificate_of_Necessity_Filed_by_Lori_V_Vaughan_Attorney_for_Trustee_on_behalf_of_Truste, #19 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000074_Notice_of_Hearing_on_Emergency_Motion_for_Contempt_and_Emergency_Motion_for_Turnover_of_Pr, #20 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000078_Interim_Order_Granting_Motion_for_Turnover_of_Property_of_the_Estate_Hearing_scheduled_for, #21 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000079_Motion_to_Extend_Time_to_Respond_to_Chapter_7_Trustees_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_Exe, #22 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000082_Motion_in_Opposition_to_Chapter_7_Trustees_Emergency_Motion_for_Contempt_andor_Sanctions, #23 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000087_Order_Partially_Granting_Motion_For_Contempt_in_Part_For_Debtors_Willfull_Violation_of_th, #24 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000090_Order_Directing_Mediation_Re_Trustees_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_Exemptions, #25 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000091_Order_Granting_Motion_to_Extend_Time_-_Extending_Time_to_File_Motions_for_Summary_Judgment, #26 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000098_Motion_in_Opposition_to_Chapter_7_Trustees_Emergency_Motion_for_Turnover_of_Funds_in_IRA, #27 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000099_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_on_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_Exemptions_Filed_by_Lori_V_V, #28 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000100_Part_1_Notice_of_Filing_Exhibits_in_Support_of_Trustees_Motion_for_Summary_Judgment_Filed_by_Lor, #29 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000100_Part_2_Exhibit, #30 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000100_Part_3_Exhibit, #31 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000100_Part_4_Exhibit, #32 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000100_Part_5_Exhibit, #33 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000101_Request_to_Take_Judicial_Notice_Filed_by_Lori_V_Vaughan_Attorney_for_Trustee_on_behalf_of, #34 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000102_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_on_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_Exemptions_Filed_by_Mark_D, #35 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000103_Notice_Regarding_Opposing_Motions_for_Summary_Judgment_on_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_E, #36 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000104_Notice_Regarding_Opposing_Motions_for_Summary_Judgment_on_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_E, #37 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000105_Notice_of_Hearing_on_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_on_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_Exempti, #38 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000106_Notice_of_Hearing_on_Motion_for_Summary_Judgment_on_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_Exempti, #39 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000107_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_Upholding_Exemption_of_IRA_Funds_Filed_by_Debtor_Andrew_B_Glas, #40 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000108_Notice_of_Preliminary_Hearing_on_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_Unholding_Exemption_of_IRA_Fu, #41 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000109_Notice_Regarding_Opposing_Motions_for_Summary_Judgment_Upholding_Exemption_of_IRA_Funds, #42 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000114_Mediators_Report_and_Notice_of_Inability_to_Reach_an_Agreement_in_Mediation_Filed_by_Lori, #43 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000115_Response_to_Debtors_Motion_for_Summary_Judgment_Upholding_Exemption_of_IRA_Funds_Filed_by, #44 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000116_Response_to_Debtors_Motion_for_Summary_Judgment_Filed_by_Mark_D_Hildreth_on_behalf_of_Cr, #45 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000122_Motion_to_Extend_Time_to_Reply_to_Responses_to_Debtors_Motion_for_Summary_Judgment_Unhold, #46 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000123_Notice_of_Preliminary_Hearing_on_Motion_to_Extend_Time_to_Reply_to_Responses_to_Debtors_M, #47 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000127_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_ANDREW_GLASS_LORI_VAUGHAN_MARK_HILD, #48 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000128_Order_Granting_Motion_to_Extend_Time_to_Reply_to_Responses_to_Debtors_Motion_for_Summary, #49 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000137_Notice_Rescheduling_Hearing_re_Trustees_objection_to_Debtors_claim_of_exemptions, #50 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000138_Notice_Rescheduling_Hearing_re_Joinder_in_Trustees_Objection_to_Claim_of_Exemptions_file, #51 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000139_Notice_Rescheduling_Hearing_re_Emergency_Motion_for_Turnover_of_Property_-_specifically, #52 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000140_Notice_Rescheduling_Hearing_re_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_on_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim, #53 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000141_Notice_Rescheduling_Hearing_re_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_on_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim, #54 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000142_Notice_Rescheduling_Hearing_re_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_Upholding_Exemption_of_IRA_Fun, #55 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000145_Motion_to_Extend_Time_to_Submit_Reply_to_Trustees_and_JRAs_Objections_and_Responses_to_D, #56 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000153_Order_Granting_Motion_to_Extend_Time_to_reply_to_Summary_Judgment_Responses, #57 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000155_Transcript_Regarding_Hearing_Held_21919_on_Matters_outlined_in_Docket_Entry_127_To_pur, #58 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000157_Response_to_Trustees_and_JRAs_Objections_and_Responses_to_Debtors_Motion_for_Summary_Ju, #59 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000166_Part_1_Notice_of_Filing_Deposition_Transcripts_in_Support_of_Trustees_Motion_for_Summary_Judgmen, #60 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000166_Part_2_Exhibit, #61 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000166_Part_3_Exhibit, #62 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000170_Notice_Rescheduling_Hearing_on_Emergency_Motion_for_Turnover_of_Property_-_specifically_F, #63 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000174_Letter_Re_re_Andrew_Glass_from_New_York_Attorney_Anthony_Yovino, #64 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000175_Response_to_Her_Honor_Judge_McEwens_Admonition_to_Prove_the_Inapplicability_of_the_Musso, #65 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000176_Limited_Response_to_Correct_Record_Filed_by_Lori_V_Vaughan_Attorney_for_Trustee_on_behalf, #66 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000187_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Andrew_Glass_Mark_Hildreth, #67 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000188_Supplement_to_Arguments_for_Exemption_of_IRA_Funds_and_Accounts_as_for_Presentation_at_the, #68 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000189_Notice_Rescheduling_Hearing_on_Trustees_Emergency_Motion_for_Turnover_of_Property_-_speci, #69 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000193_Transcript_Regarding_Hearing_Held_July_31_2019_on_Emergency_Motion_for_Turnover_of_Proper, #70 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000195_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_ANDREW_GLASS_LORI_VAUGHAN_MARK_HILD, #71 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000196_Notice_Rescheduling_Hearing_on_Emergency_Motion_for_Turnover_of_Property_-_specifically_F, #72 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000200_Order_Denying_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_filed_by_Jet_Recycling_America_Inc, #73 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000207_Part_2_Exhibit_A)(JN)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Andrew B. Glass. Related case(s): yes (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LNR)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Dawn A. Carapella. Related case(s): No (Sherman, Lynn)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 12/16/2019. (SAO)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by Dawn A. Carapella. Bankruptcy Court case number 8:18-bk-2707-CPM. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 12/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(LNR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carapella V. Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Jet Recycling America, Inc.
Represented By: Mark David Hildreth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Dawn A. Carapella
Represented By: Lori Virginia Vaughan
Represented By: Lynn Welter Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Andrew B. Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?