Blueprint IP Solutions, LLC v. Publix Asset Management Company
Plaintiff: Blueprint IP Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Publix Asset Management Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv03127
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Wernow, Howard)
February 11, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Eleanor Trotman Barnett on behalf of Publix Asset Management Company. (Barnett, Eleanor)
January 22, 2020 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 01/07/2020 by Blueprint IP Solutions, LLC as to Publix Asset Management Company. (Wernow, Howard)
January 21, 2020 Filing 13 ***TERMINATED, contacted counsel to refile using proper event.***PROOF of service by Blueprint IP Solutions, LLC (Wernow, Howard) Modified text on 1/22/2020 (LNR).
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by February 11, 2020, file a completed Case Management Report for patent cases. This document can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that the Court's Case Management Report form is different from those used by other judges. Local Rule 3.05(c)(2)(E), M.D. Fla., explains that most track two cases, like the present case, "will be tried within one year after the filing of the complaint." To accomplish this goal, the Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery. If the parties believe that more time than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. The Court will then determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/21/2020. (MWS)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or respond. Publix Asset Management Company answer or response due 2/27/2020. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/21/2020. (Covington, Virginia)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting Blueprint IP Solutions LLC's unopposed motion for extension of time. (Doc. #9). Publix Asset Management Company's response to the complaint is due February 27, 2020. If service of process has been perfected, Blueprint should file proof thereof with the Court. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/21/2020. (MWS)
January 17, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Blueprint IP Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wernow, Howard)
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Blueprint IP Solutions, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Addendum 1)(Wernow, Howard)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/26/2019. (TWL)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/26/2019. (TWL)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (LNR)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Publix Asset Management Company. (LNR)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:19-cv-3127-T-33AAS. (SJB)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Blueprint IP Solutions, LLC. (Wernow, Howard)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Publix Asset Management Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16280210) filed by Blueprint IP Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Pat. No. 8,890,980, #2 Exhibit B - Claim Chart, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wernow, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blueprint IP Solutions, LLC v. Publix Asset Management Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Publix Asset Management Company
Represented By: Eleanor Trotman Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blueprint IP Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?