Andrews-Powley et al v. Cecere et al
Plaintiff: Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti_Amen Bey, Delma Andrews-Powley and Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey
Defendant: US Bank National Association, Andrew J. Cecere, Mark C. Elia, Terrance R. Dolan, United States Inc., Michael A. Cole, Janillah A. Joeseph, Glen Messina, US Bank, Van Ness Law Firm, PLC and Caroline Tesche Arkin
Case Number: 8:2019cv03131
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ENDORSED ORDER. Plaintiff appears to seek in forma pauperis status to appeal to the Florida Second District Court of Appeals an Order of October 19, 2019. This may be an order pertaining to a state court realty foreclosure, it is not clear from the pleadings. The underlying claim here was dismissed as nonjusticiable and frivolous. The instant motion is likewise. #31 Motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency is denied. This case is closed. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 1/31/2020. (Jung, William)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ENDORSED ORDER denying #30 Motion for default. The case has been closed. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 1/31/2020. (Jung, William)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ENDORSED ORDER denying #29 motion for recusal. The case has been closed. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 1/31/2020. (Jung, William)
January 30, 2020 Filing 35 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey.(MCB)
January 30, 2020 Filing 34 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. (MCB)
January 30, 2020 Filing 33 AMENDED NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. Related case(s): yes (MCB)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ENDORSED ORDER DISMISSING DOCKET 28 WITH PREJUDICE AND NOTING THIS FILE IS CLOSED. Plaintiff has filed what may be an attempted amended complaint at Dkt. 28 in this closed case. It is no more comprehensible than the previously dismissed complaint, and is dismissed for frivolity. The filing cannot withstand or surmount the very low bars of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(b)(1)(B) and 8(a). Any further pleading attempts are futile. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 1/30/2020. (Jung, William)
January 29, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for leave to appeal in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Delma Andrews-Powley, Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. (LNR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
January 29, 2020 Filing 30 AMENDED APPLICATION to Enforce a Default by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. (LNR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
January 29, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION/Affidavit for Recusal by Delma Andrews-Powley, Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. (LNR)
January 29, 2020 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29)(LNR) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/30/2020: #30 Civil Cover Sheet) (LNR).
January 29, 2020 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice by Delma Andrews-Powley, Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. (LNR)
January 29, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Delma Andrews-Powley, Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. Related case(s): yes. (LNR)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED ORDER denying #23 Motion for Writ of Mandamus. This case is non-justiciable and frivolous. The pleadings are incomprehensible. The Clerk will hereby close this file as dismissed for frivolity. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 1/23/2020. (Jung, William)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER denying #22 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 1/23/2020. (Jung, William)
January 16, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus by Delma Andrews-Powley, Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. (LNR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
January 16, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION/Affidavit to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by Delma Andrews-Powley, Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. (LNR)
January 13, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. Related case(s): yes (TDC)
January 13, 2020 Filing 20 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. (TDC)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #17 Motion. Motions must state a justiciable ground for relief. If the Plaintiffs are seeking relief from the Florida State Circuit Court or from U.S. Bankruptcy Court, relief should be sought from those jurisdictions directly. The undersigned is powerless under the U.S. Constitution 11th amendment to control or to provide relief against a sitting Florida Circuit Judge. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 1/10/2020. (Jung, William)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #16 Motion. The Motion must state a legally-cognizable, justiciable ground for relief. If Plaintiffs are seeking relief from the State Circuit Court or the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, motions and relief should be sought in those jurisdictions, respectively. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 1/10/2020. (Jung, William)
January 7, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION/Affidavit for miscellaneous relief, specifically Fraud on the Court by Delma Andrews-Powley, Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. (LNR)
January 7, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION/AFFIDAVIT for miscellaneous relief, specifically Failure to Join Required Party by Delma Andrews-Powley, Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. (LNR)
January 7, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE re #4 Order on motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. (LNR)
January 7, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Waiver of Tort by Delma Andrews-Powley. (LNR)
January 7, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Waiver of Tort by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. (LNR)
January 7, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Acceptance for Value by Delma Andrews-Powley, Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. (LNR)
January 7, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE to withhold consent to Magistrate Judge by Delma Andrews-Powley, Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. (LNR)
January 7, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. Related case(s): yes (LNR)
January 7, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey. (LNR)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE - Objection to Notice of Track Two Designation re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti_Amen Bey. (MCB)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE to withhold consent to Magistrate Judge by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti_Amen Bey (MCB)
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti_Amen Bey. (MCB)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti_Amen Bey. Related case(s): Yes (MCB)
December 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 12/28/2019. (JMF)
December 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 12/24/2019. (SAO)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti_Amen Bey. (AG) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 13th Judicial Circuit in and for Hillsborough County, Florida, case number 18-CA-001951 Div K filed in State Court on 03/01/18. filed by Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti_Amen Bey. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Specific Performance, #2 State Court COMPLAINT Specific Performance, #3 State Court COMPLAINT Specific Performance, #4 State Court COMPLAINT Ejectment, #5 State Court COMPLAINT Replevin, #6 State Court COMPLAINT Interpleader and Declaratory Relief, #7 State Court COMPLAINT Third Party Complaint, #8 State Court Other Documents, #9 State Court Other Documents, #10 State Court Other Documents)(AG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews-Powley et al v. Cecere et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew J. Cecere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark C. Elia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrance R. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janillah A. Joeseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Messina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Ness Law Firm, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroline Tesche Arkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti_Amen Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delma Andrews-Powley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ra-Nu-Ra-Khuti-Amen Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?