United States of America v. Miller
Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: George Miller
Case Number: 8:2019mc00073
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James S Moody
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL re #3 United States of America's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. This cause is dismissed without prejudice. All pending motions, if any, are denied as moot. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 7/8/2019. (SMB)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by United States of America (Tompkins, Joseph)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons. Respondent, George Miller, is ordered to show cause in writing within twenty-one (21) days of the date he is served with this Order as to why he should not be ordered to comply with the IRS summons served on him on October 4, 2018. Failure to comply with this Order will result in an order directing Mr. Miller to fully comply with the summons and may result in sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on 6/25/2019. (BRC)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Enforce IRS Summons filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Joseph Michael Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: George Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?