Securities and Exchange Commission v. Irizarry

Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Charles Irizarry
Case Number: 8:2019mc00077
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James S Moody
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of service by Securities and Exchange Commission re #8 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations . (Goody, Elizabeth)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Report and Recommendation (Dkt. #6) of the Magistrate Judge is adopted, confirmed, and approved in all respects and is made a part of this order for all purposes, including appellate review. The Commission's application (Dkt. #1) is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 7/17/2019. (SMB)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of service by Securities and Exchange Commission re #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. . (Goody, Elizabeth)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 7/2/2019. (JMF)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith Weinstock on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission (Weinstock, Judith)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of service by Securities and Exchange Commission . (Goody, Elizabeth)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Securities and Exchange Commission. (JCG)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Securities and Exchange Commission. Related case(s): yes (JCG)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment enforcing compliance with commission order by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of defendant, #2 Exhibit Proposed final judgment)(JCG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (JCG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Irizarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Irizarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Judith Weinstock
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Goody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?