United States of America v. Shafer
Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Donald D. Shafer
Case Number: 8:2019mc00080
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Sean P Flynn
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENDORSED ORDER: Pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. #4), this case is dismissed. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/1/2019. (SGM)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by United States of America (Rudy, John)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 US Marshal 285 form for service of the Petition on Donald Shafer on 07/24/2019. (BES)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER to show cause as to Respondent Donald D. Shafer. Show Cause Hearing set for 9/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 11 B before Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. Respondent shall file any Show Cause Response on or before 9/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 7/23/2019. (CKR)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Enforce IRS Summons filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexis Monroe, #2 IRS Summons, #3 Last Chance Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(LNR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Shafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: John F. Rudy, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Donald D. Shafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?